EP3002027 - PNEUMATIC ELECTRICAL SWITCH AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Aeonmed Co., Ltd. No.4 Hangfeng Road Fengtai Science City Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BI, Huimin No.4 Hangfeng Road Fengtai Science Park Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14810769.1 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/14] | WO2014CN79856 | Priority number, date | CN201310237826 | 14.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310237826 | [2016/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198235 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002027 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/20, F16K1/00 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61M16/20 (EP,EA)
|
Former IPC [2016/14] | A61M16/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHER ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER UND MEDIZINISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG DAMIT | [2016/14] | English: | PNEUMATIC ELECTRICAL SWITCH AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2016/14] | French: | COMMUTATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE PNEUMATIQUE ET ÉQUIPEMENT MÉDICAL LE COMPRENANT | [2016/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | Translation filed | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2376735 (FLUID EQUIPMENT SERVICES LTD [GB]) [I] 1-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [I]US6202645 (BROWN ROBERT N [US]) [I] 1-10 * figures 1-9 * | International search | [A]EP0325194 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]); | [A]US5017136 (GATTI ARMANDO [IT]); | [A]CN101061350 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]CN101766857 (BEIJING AEONMED CO LTD); | [A]CN101766864 (BEIJING AEONMED CO LTD); | [A]CN202096568U (HUNAN ETER ELECTRONIC MEDICAL PROJECT STOCK CO LTD); | [A]CN102454649 (FUTAIHUA IND SHENZHEN CO LTD, et al); | [XP]CN203315507U (BEIJING AEONMED MEDICAL SYSTEM) |