EP2894954 - HEAT DISSIPATION HOUSING STRUCTURE CONNECTED TO HEAT DISSIPATION FIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marchesi Metal Technology (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Weiguo No.39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 02 /
CAMPIDELLI, Veronica MARCHESI METAL TECHNOLOGY (SUZHOU) CO LTD No39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/30] | 01 /
CHEN, Weiguo No.39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | ||
02 /
CAMPIDELLI, Veronica No.39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | |||
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
CHEN, Weiguo No. 39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | ||
02 /
KANG, Weiru No. 39 Fangda Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 14811749.2 | 02.12.2014 | [2021/32] | WO2014CN92766 | Priority number, date | CN201310649400 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310649400 | CN201310649403 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310649403 | CN201310649404 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310649404 | CN201310649405 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310649405 | CN20141087199 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410087199 | [2015/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015081842 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894954 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2894954 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H01L23/367, H01L21/48 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H01L23/3672 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/4882 (EP,KR,US);
F28F3/02 (US);
H01L21/67098 (KR);
H01L23/3675 (EP,US);
H01L23/4093 (KR);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2015/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEABLEITENDES GEHÄUSE MIT INTEGRIERTEN KÜHLRIPPEN | [2015/29] | English: | HEAT DISSIPATION HOUSING STRUCTURE CONNECTED TO HEAT DISSIPATION FIN | [2015/29] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BOÎTIER À DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR CONNECTÉE À DES AILETTES DE DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2014 | Translation filed | 19.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2014 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 25.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2014 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | TR | 11.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | GB | 02.12.2021 | IE | 02.12.2021 | LU | 02.12.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 02.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 02.12.2014 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
GB | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
LU | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1131771 (RIYOOSAN KK) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US2009194255 (HUANG TSUNG-HSIEN [TW]) [A] 7 * figures 7-11 ** paragraph [0029] *; | [XY]TWM441308U (COOLER MASTER CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-15,19-21,23 * abstract * * figure - * [Y] 16-18,22,24; | [XY]US2013153192 (LIN CHIA-YU [TW]) [X] 1-4,8-14,19,21 * figure - * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * [Y] 5-7,15-18,20,22-24; | [XY]EP2618092 (COOLER MASTER CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-4,8-14,19,21 * figure - * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * [Y] 5-7,15-18,20,22-24; | [XA]EP2620239 (COOLER MASTER CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-4,8,13,14,19-21 * figure - * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * [A] 5-7,9-12,15-18,22-24; | [A]US2013233528 (YANG CHUN-WEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-24 * figure - * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] *; | [XY]US2013255927 (LIN CHIA-YU [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,8-14,19,21 * figure - * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 5-7,15-18,20,22-24 | International search | [Y]CN2527069Y (XIWANG ELECTRONIC INST CHENGDU [CN]); | [X]CN1407671 (DEYI PREC ELECT IND CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN201383751Y (TIANJIN RUIXIN ELECTRON HEAT EXCHANGE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XP]CN103607872 (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN103607873 (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN103619142 (MARCHESI METAL TECHNOLOGY SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN103619143 (MARCHESI METAL TECHNOLOGY SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN103796457 (MARCHESI METAL TECHNOLOGY SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN203633047U (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN203633007U (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN203633005U (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN203633006U (MARCHESI METAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD); | [XP]CN203748135U (MARCHESI METAL TECHNOLOGY SUZHOU CO LTD) | Examination | US6085830 |