EP3090454 - ARRANGEMENT OF ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROMBERGER, Kolja Alexander Lehenerstrasse 111 79106 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
SMOLINKA, Tom Bauhöferstrasse 154 79115 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
WENT, Joachim Marie-Curie-Straße 1 79100 Freiburg / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/45] | 01 /
BROMBERGER, Kolja Alexander Buggingerstraße 50 79114 Freiburg / DE | ||
02 /
SMOLINKA, Tom Feldbergstraße 17 79115 Freiburg / DE | |||
03 /
WENT, Joachim Marie-Curie-Straße 1 79100 Freiburg / DE | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 14811809.4 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/45] | WO2014EP76567 | Priority number, date | DE201310225159 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013225159 | [2016/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082614 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090454 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090454 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/08, H01M2/14, H01M4/00, H01M8/18 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H01M8/18 (EP);
H01M50/40 (EP,US);
H01M4/00 (EP);
H01M50/191 (EP,US);
H01M50/193 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ELEKTROCHEMISCHER ZELLEN | [2016/45] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [2016/45] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PILES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/45] | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 13.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 13.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 13.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102006048860 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-20 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053]; claims 1-28 *; | [X]DE102009040786 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045]; claims 1-13 *; | [X]DE102011017264 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * |