EP3074307 - CARRY-ON PASSENGER SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 1400 Corporate Center Way Wellington, FL 33414 / US | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEURIFOY, Mark 1105 Wyndfall Drive Kernersville, NC 27284 / US | 02 /
KENNY, Sam 5122 Hartridgeway Greensboro, NC 27407 / US | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14812100.7 | 25.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014US67265 | Priority number, date | US201361909513P | 27.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361909513 P | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015081054 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074307 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/0639 (US);
B60N2/005 (US);
B64D11/0642 (US);
B64D11/0696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | FAHRGAST-TRAGESITZ | [2016/40] | English: | CARRY-ON PASSENGER SEAT | [2016/40] | French: | SIÈGE PASSAGER TRANSPORTABLE | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5803543 (HARTMANN JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 5 - line 33 * * figure 3 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-5; | [A]US2011170948 (WILLIAMS BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * figures 6,7 *; | [YA]GB2480809 (SMITH SUSAN DARLINGTON TUDOR [GB], et al) [Y] 2-5 * abstract * * claims 1-12 * * figures 3,4,5 * [A] 1; | [A]GB2491552 (PAIN PHILLIP [GB], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document * | Examination | US2652101 | US4729601 |