EP2905945 - INTER-TERMINAL IMAGE SHARING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Liu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/33] | 01 /
DONG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
TANG, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
YANG, Liu Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/33] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14812397.9 | 30.06.2014 | [2015/33] | WO2014CN81255 | Priority number, date | CN201310754796 | 31.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310754796 | [2015/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015100990 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2905945 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2905945 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2015/33] | H04L29/08, G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TEILUNG VON BILDERN ZWISCHEN ENDGERÄTEN, ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/33] | English: | INTER-TERMINAL IMAGE SHARING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2015/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PARTAGE D'IMAGES ENTRE DES TERMINAUX, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2014 | Translation filed | 23.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 19.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2014 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | IE | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | LU | 30.06.2017 | MT | 30.06.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.06.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2323383 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0072]; figures 5,8,9 *; | [I]US2007061399 (SCHMIEDER ROBERT W [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1A-3 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] *; | [Y] - Takahiko Horiuchi ET AL, "Colorization for Monochrome Image with Texture", 13th Color and Imaging Conference, CIC 2005, Scottsdale, Arizona, USA, November 7-11, 2005, ISBN 978-0-89-208259-9, (20051111), pages 245 - 250, URL: http://dippix.tp.chiba-u.jp/papers/CIC13_Horiuchi.pdf, (20150608), XP055194204 [Y] 3,6,9,12 * page 245 - page 250 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Blackboard collaborate - enterprise instant messaging - v4.1 User's Guide", (20120312), URL: http://www.blackboard.com/docs/documentation.htm?DocID=504001PDF, (20150608), XP055194188 [Y] 2,3,5,6,9,12 * page 59 - page 81 * | [Y] - Anonymous, "Screen share used to allow a portion of the screen - Skype Community", community.skype.com, (20130913), URL: http://community.skype.com/t5/Windows-archive/Screen-share-used-to-allow-a-portion-of-the-screen/td-p/106556, (20150608), XP055194121 [Y] 2,5 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]CN103701927 (HANGZHOU HUAWEI DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.); | [X]CN101263469 (MICROSOFT CORPORATION); | [A]CN102065267 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.); | [A]CN102724138 (QIZHI SOFTWARE (BEIJING) CO., LTD.); | [A]CN103092524 (GUANG DONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO., LTD.); | [A]US2012317485 (CISCO TECHNOLOGY, INC.) | Examination | US2009091772 | - KIMBERLY TEE ET AL, Providing artifact awareness to a distributed group through screen sharing, COMPUTER SUPPORTED COOPERATIVE WORK, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, PAGE(S) 99 - 108, (20061104), ISBN 978-1-59593-249-5, XP058157026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1180875.1180891 |