EP3011657 - MEDICAL DEVICE BATTERY CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 1 University Avenue Macquarie University New South Wales 2109 / AU | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESKENS, Werner 1 University Avenue Macquarie University NSW 2109 / AU | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/17] | Application number, filing date | 14813326.7 | 19.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014IB01965 | Priority number, date | US201313922856 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: US201313922856 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014203079 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3011657 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, A61N1/378, A61N1/36, H02J5/00, H02J7/02 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
H02J7/00036 (EP,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
A61N1/36038 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINER BATTERIE EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/17] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE BATTERY CHARGING SYSTEM AND METHODS | [2016/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE DE DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ET PROCÉDÉS | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 07.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2020 | 12.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/53] | 22.08.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 07.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003114899 (WOODS CARLA MANN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0223]; figures 7-9 *; | [X]US2010305662 (OZAWA ROBERT DAI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO2013059441 (WITRICITY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065]; figures 8,10 * | International search | [A]JP2009021910 (RION CO); | [Y]US2010060232 (BOYLES SAMUEL [US], et al); | [A]US2010295372 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al); | [X]US2012189146 (WUIDART LUC [FR]); | [A]KR20120085980 (LEE SEUNG TAEK [KR], et al) |