EP3010415 - A REMOTELY POWERED SENSOR WITH ANTENNA LOCATION INDEPENDENT OF SENSING SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senseonics, Incorporated 20451 Seneca Meadows Parkway Germantown, MD 20876-7005 / US | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEHENNIS, Andrew 18909 Moonwalk Court Germantown, MD 20874 / US | 02 /
WHITEHURST, Todd c/o Senseonics Incoporated 20451 Seneca Meadows Parkway Germantown, MD 20876 / US | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Zijlstra, Robert Wiebo Johan Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14814052.8 | 19.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014US43165 | Priority number, date | US201361836721P | 19.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361836721 P | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205205 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3010415 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, G01N21/64, A61B5/1459 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/1459 (EP,US);
A61B5/0015 (US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/162 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | A61B5/145, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | FERNGESPEISTER SENSOR MIT ERFASSUNGSSTELLENUNABHÄNGIGER ANTENNENPOSITION | [2016/17] | English: | A REMOTELY POWERED SENSOR WITH ANTENNA LOCATION INDEPENDENT OF SENSING SITE | [2016/17] | French: | CAPTEUR ALIMENTÉ À DISTANCE AYANT UN EMPLACEMENT D'ANTENNE INDÉPENDANT D'UN SITE DE DÉTECTION | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006127694 (DEXCOM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0138] , [0252] , [0253] , [0261] - [0263]; figures 3C, 3F *; | [XI]WO2008089282 (SILVER JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 45, lines 3-27 * * page 66, lines 7-11 * * page 98, lines 6-27 * * page 101, lines 1-17 * * figure 18 *[I] 2-7 | International search | [X]US6400974 (LESHO JEFFERY C [US]); | [A]US2007156205 (LARSON DENNIS E [US], et al); | [A]US2010280568 (BULKES CHERIK [US], et al) | by applicant | US5517313 | US6330464 | US6400974 | WO2006127694 | WO2008089282 | US7553280 | US7822450 | US2013211213 |