EP3063042 - DYNAMIC ROLLOVER PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Desarrollo Tecnológico Agroindustrial Parque Cientifico Tecnológico Rabanales 21 Edificio Aldebarán - Modulo 2 14014 Córdoba / ES | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHACON, Fernando C/ Tartesos nº8 1º A E-14011 Córdoba / ES | 02 /
BLANCO, Gregorio C/ Pasaje de la Estrella n6 b1 E-14001 Córdoba / ES | 03 /
GIL, Jesus C/ Escualtor Alberto Sanchez 24 E-14012 Córdoba / ES | 04 /
HERMOSIN, Mateo C/Gutiérrez de los Ríos nº9 E-14002 Córdoba / ES | 05 /
GAMARRA, Juan Luis C/ Tartesos Nº8 1º A E-14011 Córdoba / ES | 06 /
GARCIA, Jose Candido C/ Arona 67 E-41089 Dos Hermanas (Sevilla) / ES | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Schlich, George William, et al Schlich 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14814779.6 | 03.11.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014EP73607 | Priority number, date | US201361899248P | 03.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361899248 P | US201361916798P | 17.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361916798 P | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063309 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063042 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/013 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60Q3/60 (US);
B60Q3/80 (US);
B60R21/0132 (US);
B60W40/08 (US);
B60W50/14 (US);
G01S19/14 (US);
G01S19/42 (US);
G01S19/52 (US);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G07C5/008 (US);
G07C5/085 (US);
G07C5/0866 (US);
B60R2021/01013 (US);
B60R2021/01304 (US);
B60R2021/01306 (US);
B60W2040/0809 (US);
B60W2050/143 (US);
B60W2050/146 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES ÜBERROLLSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2016/36] | English: | DYNAMIC ROLLOVER PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2016/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DYNAMIQUE CONTRE LES TONNEAUX | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6397133 (VAN DER POL PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15,17-20,24-27,29 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 22 * * column 13, line 50 - column 14, line 17 * [I] 8,16,30,31; | [X]DE10242687 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,9* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0024] *; | [XI]US2005102083 (XU LIWEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11,12,28,29,32-35 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 30,31; | [X]US2006106538 (BROWNE ALAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0027] *; | [X]DE102012210714 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] * | by applicant | WO2011ES70646 |