EP3230641 - CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR ONE OR MORE FLEXIBLE TUBES WITH IMPROVED FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2018/48] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 56182 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIEDT, Christoph Bergstrasse 8 88483 Burgrieden / DE | 02 /
CLAUS, Ralf Adenauerstrasse 33 89171 Illerkirchberg / DE | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Finkele, Rolf Gardena Manufacturing GmbH Hans-Lorenser-Straße 40 89079 Ulm / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 14815621.9 | 10.12.2014 | [2017/42] | WO2014EP77163 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091295 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230641 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230641 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/24 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
F16L33/24 (EP,CN);
F16L37/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT FÜR EIN ODER MEHRERE SCHLÄUCHE MIT VERBESSERTER FIXIERUNG | [2017/42] | English: | CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR ONE OR MORE FLEXIBLE TUBES WITH IMPROVED FIXATION | [2017/42] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UN OU PLUSIEURS TUBES FLEXIBLES AVEC FIXATION AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2014 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | IE | 10.12.2018 | LU | 10.12.2018 | MT | 10.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | GB | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
GB | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
MT | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.12.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 10.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3788676 (LOSSIE R) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0533638 (GOBBI GIANFRANCO [IT]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 7; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0886096 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 7-30 * * column 7, line 8 - column 10, line 42; figures 2-5 * |