EP3086784 - BICALUTAMIDE ANALOGS OR (S)-BICALUTAMIDE AS EXOCYTOSIS ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF A LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISORDER OR GLYCOGENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/44] | BICALUTAMIDE ANALOGS OR (S)-BI CALUTAM IDE AS EXOCYTOSIS ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF A LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISORDER OR GLYCOGENOSIS | ||
[2018/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BCN Peptides, S.A. Polígono Industrial Els Vinyets-Els Fogars Ctra. Comarcal 244, km 22 08777 Sant Quintí de Mediona / ES | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRERA-SINFREU, Josep Cap de la Vila 3 E-25595 Tírvia / ES | 02 /
MATALONGA BORREL, Leslie Ferran Puig 82 ático 3ª E-08023 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
GORT MAS, Laura Av. Osona 24 E-08550 Balenyà / ES | 04 /
PASCUAL MARTÍNEZ, Roberto Primavera 18 2º D E-03012 Alicante / ES | 05 /
FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio Periodista Asunción Valdés 3 Bloque Y 2ºN E-03540 Alicante / ES | 06 /
RIBES RUBIÓ, Antonia Alexandre Soler i March 1 E-08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 07 /
PONSATI OBIOLS, Berta Alaba 50 3º 2ª E-08005 Barcelona / ES | [2019/10] |
Former [2016/44] | 01 /
FARRERA-SINFREU, Josep Cap de la Vila 3 E-25595 Tírvia / ES | ||
02 /
MATALONGA BORREL, Leslie Ferran Puig 82 ático 3ª E-08023 Barcelona / ES | |||
03 /
GORT MAS, Laura Serreta 34 E-08550 Balenyà / ES | |||
04 /
PASCUAL MARTÍNEZ, Roberto Primavera 18 2º D E-03012 Alicante / ES | |||
05 /
FERRER MONTIEL, Antonio Periodista Asunción Valdés 3 Bloque Y 2ºN E-03540 Alicante / ES | |||
06 /
RIBES RUBIÓ, Antonia Alexandre Soler i March 1 E-08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | |||
07 /
PONSATI OBIOLS, Berta Alaba 50 3º 2ª E-08005 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14815747.2 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014EP78745 | Priority number, date | EP20130382541 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13382541 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015097088 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086784 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086784 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3086784 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61P3/00, A61K31/00, G01N33/566, A61K31/277 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/277 (RU,US);
A61K31/07 (KR);
A61K31/355 (KR);
A61K31/375 (KR);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61K47/42 (RU,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K9/51 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
C07C317/32 (RU);
C07C323/41 (RU);
C07C331/28 (RU);
G01N33/566 (US);
G01N2333/70596 (US);
G01N2800/7066 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | A61K31/00, A61K31/167 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BICALUTAMID-ANALOGA ODER (S)-BICALUTAMID ALS EXOZYTOSE-AKTIVIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG EINER LYSOSOMALEN SPEICHERKRANKHEIT ODER GLYCOGENOSE | [2018/34] | English: | BICALUTAMIDE ANALOGS OR (S)-BICALUTAMIDE AS EXOCYTOSIS ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF A LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISORDER OR GLYCOGENOSIS | [2018/34] | French: | ANALOGUES DE BICALUTAMIDE OU (S)-BICALUTAMIDE COMME COMPOSÉS ACTIVANT L'EXOCYTOSE POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'UN TROUBLE DE SURCHARGE LYSOSOMALE OU UNE GLYCOGÉNOSE | [2018/34] |
Former [2016/44] | BICALUTAMID-ANALOGA ODER (S)-BI-CALUTAMID ALS EXOZYTOSE-AKTIVIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON LYSOSOMALEN SPEICHERKRANKHEITEN ODER GLYKOGENOSE | ||
Former [2016/44] | BICALUTAMIDE ANALOGS OR (S)-BI CALUTAM IDE AS EXOCYTOSIS ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF A LYSOSOMAL STORAGE DISORDER OR GLYCOGENOSIS | ||
Former [2016/44] | ANALOGUES DU BICALUTAMIDE OU (S)-BICALUTAMIDE EN TANT QUE COMPOSÉS ACTIVANT L'EXOCYTOSE POUR LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'UN TROUBLE DE SURCHARGE LYSOSOMALE OU DE LA GLYCOGENÈSE | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | LU | 19.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 27.03.2019 | |
RS | 27.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008008433 (UNIV TENNESSEE RES FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011109448 (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2010015816 | WO2011109448 | US2013023488 |