EP3068969 - DOWNHOLE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xtreme Well Technology Limited Craigenkerrie Farm Glassel Banchory Aberdeenshire AB31 4DT / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Xtreme Well Technology Limited Craigenkerrie Farm Glassel Banchory Aberdeenshire AB31 4DT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOYES, Peter c/o Xtreme Well Technology Limited Craigenkerrie Farm Glassel Banchory Aberdeenshire AB31 4DT / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2016/38] | 01 /
MOYES, Peter c/o Xtreme Well Technology Limited Sheriffburn House Broomhill Kintore Aberdeenshire AB51 0XA / GB | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2023/39] |
Former [2016/38] | Lincoln, Matthew, et al Lincoln IP 9 Victoria Street Aberdeen AB10 1XB / GB | Application number, filing date | 14815789.4 | 11.11.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014GB53347 | Priority number, date | GB20130019883 | 11.11.2013 Original published format: GB 201319883 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015067972 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3068969 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068969 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/00, E21B33/128, E21B23/01, E21B23/06 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
E21B23/01 (EP,GB,US);
E21B23/006 (EP,GB,US);
E21B23/00 (GB);
E21B23/0411 (EP,GB,US);
E21B23/06 (EP,GB,US);
E21B33/128 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | E21B23/00, E21B23/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG | [2016/38] | English: | DOWNHOLE TOOL | [2016/38] | French: | OUTIL DE FOND DE TROU | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 08.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2018 | Decision despatched | 08.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2017 | Decision despatched | 08.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3398795 (ELLISTON THOMAS L) [X] 1-19,25-30,36,45,46,48-61,67,69-71,73,74,76-79 * column 1, line 33 - line 41 * * column 7, line 13 - column 9, line 23 ** figure - *; | [XI]US2006272828 (MANSON DAVID J C [AU]) [X] 1-9,15-32,36,37,43,45,46,48-53,57-61,67,69-71,73,74,76,78,79 * the whole document * [I] 33-35,38-42,44,47,56,62-66,68,72,75 |