EP3055712 - CONVERSION FILM FOR CONVERSION OF IONIZING RADIATION, RADIATION DETECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/33] | CONVERSION FILM FOR CONVERTING IONIZING RADIATION, RADIATION DETECTOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION | ||
[2018/22] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜCHELE, Patric Reisergasse 2 89129 Langenau / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, David Heerfleckenstr. 40 91056 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Oliver Petra Kellyweg 32 91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
TEDDE, Sandro Francesco Karlsbaderstrasse 4 91085 Weisendorf / DE | 05 /
WECKER, Joachim Eichenring 29 91341 Röttenbach / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
BÜCHELE, Patric Am Röthelheim 57 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
02 /
HARTMANN, David Heerfleckenstr. 40 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMIDT, Oliver Petra Kellyweg 32 91052 Erlangen / DE | |||
04 /
TEDDE, Sandro Francesco Karlsbaderstrasse 4 91085 Weisendorf / DE | |||
05 /
WECKER, Joachim Eichenring 29 91341 Röttenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 14816175.5 | 10.12.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014EP77197 | Priority number, date | DE201310226338 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013226338 | DE201410203685 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014203685 | [2016/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015091145 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055712 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/16, G01T1/20 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
G01T1/16 (EP,US);
G01T1/2002 (US);
G01T1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | KONVERSIONSFOLIE ZUR KONVERSION VON IONISIERENDER STRAHLUNG, STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG | [2016/33] | English: | CONVERSION FILM FOR CONVERSION OF IONIZING RADIATION, RADIATION DETECTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2018/22] | French: | FEUILLE DE CONVERSION POUR LA CONVERSION DE RAYONNEMENT IONISANT, DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/22] |
Former [2016/33] | CONVERSION FILM FOR CONVERTING IONIZING RADIATION, RADIATION DETECTOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION | ||
Former [2016/33] | FILM DE CONVERSION POUR CONVERTIR UN RAYONNEMENT IONISANT, DÉTECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 03.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009179155 (WEINBERG IRVING [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-14 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 1, 4 * [I] 9; | [XI]US2013032720 (LEE DENNY LAP YEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10,12-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 3, 4 *[I] 9 | Examination | US2007085010 | DE102011083692 | by applicant | EP0126564 | DE4142150 |