EP3013852 - COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS VACCINES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/18] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS VACCINES | ||
[2018/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill 308 Bynum Hall Campus Box 4105 Chapel Hill, NC 27599 / US | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESSER, William 4605 NW Woodside Terrace Portland, Oregon 97210 / US | 02 /
BARIC, Ralph 2600 North Stream Court Haw River, North Carolina 27258 / US | 03 /
DESILVA, Aravinda 419 Whitehead Circle Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27514 / US | 04 /
YOUNT, Boyd 1002 Scotsburg Trail Hillsborough, North Carolina 27278 / US | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 14817079.8 | 26.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014US44410 | Priority number, date | US201361839687P | 26.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361839687 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014210358 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3013852 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3013852 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/005, C12N15/62, A61K38/16, A61P31/12, C07K14/18 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K14/1825 (US);
C07K16/1081 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24121 (US);
C12N2770/24122 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24134 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/18] | C07K14/005, C12N15/62, A61K38/16, A61P31/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DENGUE-VIRUS-IMPFSTOFFE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2018/52] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS VACCINES AND THEIR USE | [2018/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR DES VACCINS CONTRE LE VIRUS DE LA DENGUE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2018/52] |
Former [2016/18] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DENGUE-VIRUS-IMPFSTOFFE | ||
Former [2016/18] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DENGUE VIRUS VACCINES | ||
Former [2016/18] | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DES VACCINS CONTRE LE VIRUS DE LA DENGUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19176621.1 / EP3590955 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2014 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | IE | 26.06.2019 | LU | 26.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.06.2014 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]WO2013151764 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,10-15 * the whole document, in particular page 8, line 21 to page 9, line 9; page 11, lines 1-23; Example 2; claims 4, 5, 7, 28, 29, 33-38 * [I] 7,9; | [XI] - RAVIPRAKASH K ET AL, "A chimeric tetravalent dengue DNA vaccine elicits neutralizing antibody to all four virus serotypes in rhesus macaques", VIROLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 353, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.VIROL.2006.05.005, ISSN 0042-6822, (20060915), pages 166 - 173, (20060915), XP024896386 [X] 1-5,11,14,15 * the whole document, in particular abstract; page 167, paragraph spanning columns; page 169, column 2, lines 3-6; paragraph spanning pages 171 and 172; figures 1, 3, 4 * [I] 6-10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2006.05.005 | [XI] - BIELEFELDT-OHMANN H ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF A RECOMBINANT DENGUE-2 VIRUS-DENGUE-3 VIRUS HYBRID ENVELOPPE PROTEIN EXPRESSED IN A SECRETORY BACULOVIRUS SYSTEM", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, SPENCERS WOOD, GB, (19971101), vol. 78, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2723 - 2733, XP000885552 [X] 1,3,11,13,15 * the whole document, in particular abstract; page 2527, column 1, lines 41-44; figure 2 * [I] 2,4-10,12,14 | [T] - WILLIAM B. MESSER ET AL, "Functional Transplant of a Dengue Virus Serotype 3 (DENV3)-Specific Human Monoclonal Antibody Epitope into DENV1", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., US, (20160309), vol. 90, no. 10, doi:10.1128/JVI.00155-16, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5090 - 5097, XP055332250 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00155-16 | International search | [A]WO0103729 (HAWAII BIOTECH GROUP [US], et al); | [A]US2011059131 (CHANG GWONG-JEN J [US], et al); | [A]WO2011119716 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [A]EA015907 (SANOFI PASTEUR BIOLOGICS CO [US]) |