EP3014330 - SAMPLE PROCESSING IMPROVEMENTS FOR MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alentic Microscience Inc. 1344 Summer Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 0A8 / CA | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINE, Alan Marc 57 Bayview Crescent Prospect, Nova Scotia B3T 2C9 / CA | 02 /
MACAULAY, Hershel 135 Eaglewood Drive Bedford, Nova Scotia B4A 3B6 / CA | 03 /
HYMES-VANDERMEULEN, Noah 128 Glenforest Drive Halifax, Nova Scotia B3M 1J1 / CA | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2016/18] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14817587.0 | 25.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014CA50610 | Priority number, date | US201361839735P | 26.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361839735 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014205576 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014330 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3014330 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 31.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/34, G01N21/59, G01N15/14, G01N1/40, G01N33/49, G01N15/00, G01N35/00, G01N15/06 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
G02B21/34 (EP,US);
G01N1/28 (US);
G01N1/4077 (EP,US);
G01N15/0612 (EP,US);
G01N15/1468 (EP,US);
G01N21/59 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N15/0606 (US);
G01N2015/016 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | G02B21/26, G01N1/28, G01N15/00, G01N15/02, G01N15/06, G01N21/59, G01N33/483, G01N1/14, B01L3/00, G01N35/00, G01N1/31 | ||
Former IPC [2016/18] | G02B21/26, G01N1/28, G01N15/00, G01N15/02, G01N15/06, G01N21/59, G01N33/483, G01N1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN ZUR PROBENVERARBEITUNG FÜR MIKROSKOPIE | [2016/18] | English: | SAMPLE PROCESSING IMPROVEMENTS FOR MICROSCOPY | [2016/18] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON DESTINÉES À LA MICROSCOPIE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2022 | 30.06.2023 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3447863 (PATTERSON JAMES A) [X] 1,6 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US4950455 (SMITH KENDALL O [US]) [X] 1,6 * figures 4-6 * [I] 2-5; | [I]US6180314 (BERNDT KLAUS W [US]) [I] 1-13 * figures 2, 3 *; | [X]US6302985 (TAKAHASHI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2013052331 (KRAM BRIAN HOWARD [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-7 *; | [A] - AYDOGAN OZCAN ET AL, "Ultra wide-field lens-free monitoring of cells on-chip", LAB ON A CHIP, (20080101), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1039/b713695a, ISSN 1473-0197, page 98, XP055051174 [A] 1-13 * figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B713695A | International search | [A]US6723290 (WARDLAW STEPHEN C [US]); | [A]US2007087442 (WARDLAW STEPHEN C [US]); | [A]US2007243117 (WARDLAW STEPHEN C [US]); | [X]EP2330215 (CLONDIAG GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2554987 (ABBOTT POINT OF CARE INC [US]) | Examination | US2008213804 |