EP3074501 - ENERGY HARVESTING SYSTEM FOR HARVESTING RENEWABLE ENERGY, BIOMASS COLLECTING SYSTEM, AND COMPONENTS OF SAID SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gallersdörfer, Peter Konradshöhe 33 92637 Weiden / DE | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Rosenheimer Straße 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14818897.2 | 28.11.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014EP76018 | Priority number, date | DE201310113207 | 28.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013113207 | DE201410114753 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: DE102014114753 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015079047 | Date: | 04.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3074501 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/107, C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12M1/09, C12M1/33 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/30 (EP);
C12M23/44 (EP);
C12M23/52 (EP);
C12M23/56 (EP);
C12M43/04 (EP);
C12M43/08 (EP);
C12M45/02 (EP);
C12M45/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | ENERGIEGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM ZUR GEWINNUNG ERNEUERBARER ENERGIE SOWIE BIOMASSESAMMELSYSTEM UND KOMPONENTEN DIESER SYSTEME | [2016/40] | English: | ENERGY HARVESTING SYSTEM FOR HARVESTING RENEWABLE ENERGY, BIOMASS COLLECTING SYSTEM, AND COMPONENTS OF SAID SYSTEMS | [2016/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE RENOUVELABLE AINSI QUE SYSTÈME COLLECTEUR DE BIOMASSE ET COMPOSANTS DE CES SYSTÈMES | [2016/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112(1) EPÜ (EPA Form 2524 vom 04/03/2024) | Gallersdörfer, Peter Konradshöhe 33 92637 Weiden / DE | [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2018 | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2019 | 30.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.12.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.12.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.12.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.12.2023 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.03.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2020/20] | 01.12.2023 | Resumption of proceedings | [2023/26] | 23.03.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2023/26] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3835230 (HOLSTEINER GAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 35 * * column 3, lines 27-39 *; | [A]DE4126703 (TRAMM-WERNER, SABINE; DE) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [X]DE19857870 (RES & DEV OF RENEWABLE ENERGY [IE]) [X] 1,10,15,19 * column 1 - column 3 * * columns 5,7,8 * * figure - *; | [X]DE10021383 (WEA WASTE ENERGY ACTION INTERN [IE]) [X] 1,10,15,19 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0011] , [0016] , [0023] , [0027] , [0034] , [0051] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102004010539 (EVS EN VERSORGUNGS SERVICE [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0011] - [0020] - [0031] , [0032] *; | [Y]WO2009101393 (PARRY JULIAN [GB]) [Y] 1-20 * pages 6,9-11 * * figures 1,4,5,7A; claim - *; | [A]WO2010100224 (ECOCITY PROJECT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,15,19,20* page 2 - page 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102009018126 (ZSW [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0013] , [0016] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102009032122 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0033] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038] , [0041] , [0044] *; | [A]DE102011114171 (THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102012010542 (CCP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * paragraphs [0009] - [0025]; figure - *; | [A]DE102012203148 (WERNER HANS [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0020] , [0021] , [0030] , [0040] *; | [A]DE102012103458 (HELMHOLTZ ZENTRUM POTSDAM DEUTSCHES GEOFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GFZ STIFTUNG DES OEFFENTLICHEN RECHTS DES L [DE]) [A] 1,10,15,19,20 * paragraph [0012] * |