EP2886038 - ENDOSCOPE CONNECTION INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/26] | ENDOSCOPE CONNECTOR | ||
[2019/24] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Norito OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/26] | 01 /
SATO, Norito c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14819660.3 | 09.05.2014 | WO2014JP62423 | Priority number, date | JP20130139889 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013139889 | [2015/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001843 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886038 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/12, A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A61B1/123 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/00119 (CN);
A61B1/00128 (EP,US);
A61B1/00131 (CN);
A61B1/12 (US);
A61B1/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | A61B1/12, G02B23/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPVERBINDUNGSINSTRUMENT | [2019/24] | English: | ENDOSCOPE CONNECTION INSTRUMENT | [2019/24] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE RACCORD D'ENDOSCOPE | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/26] | ENDOSKOPVERBINDER | ||
Former [2015/26] | ENDOSCOPE CONNECTOR | ||
Former [2015/26] | RACCORD D'ENDOSCOPE | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2015 | Translation filed | 13.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 24.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4733428 (MALINGE JEAN L [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 51 ** figure 2 *; | [XY]US6210322 (BYRNE DONNY M [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8-12 * column 5, lines 9-45 * * column 6, line 10 - column 7, line 2 * * column 7, lines 11-13 * * figures 1-4, 8 * [Y] 2,6,7; | [Y]US6286179 (BYRNE DONNY M [US]) [Y] 2,6,7 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 49 * * figures 5, 6 *; | [A]US2013138061 (YAMANE KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]JPH10234666 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2003116789 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2006006565 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2010011977 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [A]JP2012040240 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JPH10234666 | JP2012040240 |