EP3017387 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING USER BROWSING BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states [24]7.ai, Inc. 2001 Logic Drive, Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [2019/45] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states 24/7 Customer, Inc. 910 E. Hamilton Avenue Suite 240 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISHNAMOORTHY, Prabhakaran Pilikkal Palayam (PO) Jader Palayam (via) Namakkat (Dt) Tamilnadu 637213 / IN | 02 /
CHAKI, Sourabh Embassy Golf Links Business Park Off Intermediate Ring Road Bangalore 560071 / IN | 03 /
VERMA, Neha Embassy Golf Links Business Park Off Intermediate Ring Road Bangalore 560071 / IN | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14819693.4 | 01.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014US45093 | Priority number, date | US201361841832P | 01.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361841832 P | US201414320440 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US201414320440 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002974 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017387 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q30/02, H04L29/08, G06F3/0483 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
G06F3/0483 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON BENUTZERDURSUCHVERHALTEN | [2016/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING USER BROWSING BEHAVIOR | [2016/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER UN COMPORTEMENT DE NAVIGATION D'UTILISATEUR | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006230058 (MORRIS ROBERT P [US]) [Y] 2,7-9,14,15 * abstract ** paragraphs: 0003-0007, 0013-0088 *; | [Y]US2007005646 (DUMAIS SUSAN T [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-6,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs: 0004, 0016, 0019-0026, 0030-0038 *; | [Y]US2011239138 (GALUSHKA NATALIYA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0061] * | International search | [Y]US6260036 (ALMASI GEORGE S [US], et al); | [Y]US2006112123 (CLARK KYLE A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008120406 (AHMED MOHAMMAD M [US], et al); | [Y]US2011082984 (YUAN SONG [SE]); | [Y]US2012076283 (AJMERA DINESH [IN], et al); | [Y]US2013031490 (JOO YOUNG KUN [US], et al) |