EP3017820 - APPLICATION OF ADSORBED DRONE BROOD HOMOGENATE AND OF VITAMIN D3 OR D-GROUP VITAMINS AND/OR ACTIVE METABOLITES THEREOF FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING VIRAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obshestvo S Ogranichennoj Otvetstvennostju "PARAFARM" ul. Sverdlova 4 Penza 440026 / RU | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUKOV, Villorij Ivanovich Karpinskogo 33-135 g. Penza 440011 / RU | 02 /
PROKHOROV, Mikhail Dmitrievich ul. Pushkina d. 25 kv. 104 g. Penza 440011 / RU | 03 /
JONES-STRUKOVA, Olga 3633 Lafayette Avenue Fort Worth Texas, 76107 / US | 04 /
TRIFONOV, Vjacheslav Nikolaevich ul. 30-Letija Pobedy 45-89 Zarechnyj Penza 442960 / RU | 05 /
ELISTRATOVA, Julija Anatol'evna ul. Volodarskogo 9a-68 g. Penza 440026 / RU | 06 /
ELISTRATOV, Konstantin Gennad'evich ul. Tolstogo 5-45 g. Penza 440061 / RU | 07 /
KURUS', Natalya Vjacheslavovna Volodarskogo 9-66 g. Penza 440026 / RU | 08 /
EREMINA, Natalya Vyacheslavovna pr. Stroitelej 36-90 g. Penza 440047 / RU | 09 /
MAKSIMOVA, Marina Nikolaevna ul. Suvorova 139-135 g. Penza 440044 / RU | 10 /
GALEEVA, Ramziya Timurshovna pr-kt Stroitelej 48-363 g. Penza 440062 / RU | 11 /
RADCHENKO, Larisa Grigorievna ul. Mira 68-38 g. Penza 440062 / RU | 12 /
FEDOROV, Aleksandr Viktorovich ul. Kalinina 116-103 Kuznetsk g. Penza 440026 / RU | 13 /
KRUTYAKOV, Evgeny Nikolaevich ul. Ladozhskaya 115-125 g. Penza 440011 / RU | 14 /
ELISTRATOVA, Tatiana Viktorovna ul. Suvorova 192A-49 g. Penza 440026 / RU | 15 /
KHOMYAKOVA, Irina Vladimirovna ul. Ternovskogo 203-185 g. Penza 440026 / RU | 16 /
TOLBINA, Galina Anatolievna ul. Gogolya 5-22 g. Penza 440026 / RU | [2016/26] |
Former [2016/19] | 01 /
STRUKOV, Villorij Ivanovich Karpinskogo 33-135 g. Penza 440011 / RU | ||
02 /
PROKHOROV, Mikhail Dmitrievich ul. Pushkina d. 25 kv. 104 g. Penza 440011 / RU | |||
03 /
JONES-STRUKOVA, Olga 820 Parkway South Quarry Grand Prairie, Texas 75051 / US | |||
04 /
TRIFONOV, Vjacheslav Nikolaevich ul. 30-Letija Pobedy 45-89 Zarechnyj Penza 442960 / RU | |||
05 /
ELISTRATOVA, Julija Anatol'evna ul. Volodarskogo 9a-68 g. Penza 440026 / RU | |||
06 /
ELISTRATOV, Konstantin Gennad'evich ul. Tolstogo 5-45 g. Penza 440061 / RU | |||
07 /
KURUS', Natalya Vjacheslavovna Volodarskogo 9-66 g. Penza 440026 / RU | |||
08 /
EREMINA, Natalya Vyacheslavovna pr. Stroitelej 36-90 g. Penza 440047 / RU | |||
09 /
MAKSIMOVA, Marina Nikolaevna ul. Suvorova 139-135 g. Penza 440044 / RU | |||
10 /
GALEEVA, Ramziya Timurshovna pr-kt Stroitelej 48-363 g. Penza 440062 / RU | |||
11 /
RADCHENKO, Larisa Grigorievna ul. Mira 68-38 g. Penza 440062 / RU | |||
12 /
FEDOROV, Aleksandr Viktorovich ul. Kalinina 116-103 Kuznetsk g. Penza 440026 / RU | |||
13 /
KRUTYAKOV, Evgeny Nikolaevich ul. Ladozhskaya 115-125 g. Penza 440011 / RU | |||
14 /
ELISTRATOVA, Tatiana Viktorovna ul. Suvorova 192A-49 g. Penza 440026 / RU | |||
15 /
KHOMYAKOVA, Irina Vladimirovna ul. Ternovskogo 203-185 g. Penza 440026 / RU | |||
16 /
TOLBINA, Galina Anatolievna ul. Gogolya 5-22 g. Penza 440026 / RU | Representative(s) | Engel, Christoph Klaus PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2016/19] | Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel Patentanwaltskanzlei Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14820283.1 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014RU00487 | Priority number, date | RU20130130302 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: RU 2013130302 | [2016/19] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002576 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | RU | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017820 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017820 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/64, A61K31/593, A61P31/12 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K35/64 (US);
A61K35/63 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/63, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ADSORBIERTEM DROHNENBRUT-HOMOGENAT UND VON VITAMIN D3 ODER VITAMINEN DER D-GRUPPE UND/ODER AKTIVEN METABOLITEN DAVON ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON VIRUSERKRANKUNGEN | [2016/19] | English: | APPLICATION OF ADSORBED DRONE BROOD HOMOGENATE AND OF VITAMIN D3 OR D-GROUP VITAMINS AND/OR ACTIVE METABOLITES THEREOF FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING VIRAL DISEASES | [2016/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'HOMOGÉNAT DE COUVAIN DE FAUX-BOURDONS ADSORBÉ ET DE VITAMINE D3 OU DE VITAMINES DU GROUPE D ET/OU DE LEURS MÉTABOLITES ACTIFS POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DES MALADIES VIRALES | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2016 | Translation filed | 29.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2014 | AL | 26.06.2019 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | LU | 03.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 03.07.2014 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 03.07.2014 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5580297 (BENGSCH EBERHARD [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 4; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2013039424 (OBSHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOJ OTVETSTVENNOSTJU PARAFARM [RU], et al) [Y] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [Y] - GERRY K. SCHWALFENBERG, "A review of the critical role of vitamin D in the functioning of the immune system and the clinical implications of vitamin D deficiency", MOLECULAR NUTRITION & FOOD RESEARCH, (20110101), vol. 55, no. 1, doi:10.1002/mnfr.201000174, ISSN 1613-4125, pages 96 - 108, XP055017925 [Y] 1 * page 99, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 101, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.201000174 | International search | [Y]RU2233666 (PIATIGORSKAYA GOSUDARSTVENNAYA FARMATSEVTICHESKAYA AKADEMIYA); | [Y] - URASHIMA M ET AL., "Randomized trial of vitamin D supplementation to prevent seasonal influenza A in schoolchildren.", AM J CLIN NUTR., (2010), vol. 91, no. 5, pages 1255 - 1260, XP055310238 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3945/ajcn.2009.29094 | [Y] - TRUTNEVYI GOMOGENAT, (20130118), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.edka.ru/food/trutnev-homogenate, XP055310241 | by applicant | RU2466732 |