EP3016601 - OCCLUSION SHEATH FOR IMAGING CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avinger, Inc. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMPSON, John, B. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
KETAI, Theodore, W. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 03 /
ASKEW, Mark, W. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 04 /
LOH, Serena, S. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 05 /
NGUYEN, Guip, T. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 06 /
DAVIES, Stephen, C. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 07 /
NEWHAUSER, Richard, R. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 08 /
SMITH, Peter, H. 400 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14820705.3 | 01.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014US45132 | Priority number, date | US201361841843P | 01.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361841843 P | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015002997 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3016601 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61F2/06, A61M25/01, A61M25/04, A61M25/06, A61M25/10, A61B1/00, A61B1/012, A61B5/00, A61B17/3207 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61B1/00082 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (US);
A61B1/012 (EP,US);
A61B17/3207 (US);
A61B5/0066 (US);
A61M2025/1052 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | A61B17/22, A61F2/06, A61M25/01, A61M25/04, A61M25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | OKKLUSIONSSCHLEUSE FÜR BILDGEBENDEN KATHETER | [2016/19] | English: | OCCLUSION SHEATH FOR IMAGING CATHETER | [2016/19] | French: | GAINE D'OCCLUSION POUR CATHÉTER D'IMAGERIE | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 04.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4841977 (GRIFFITH JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 14 * ; abstract *; | [Y]EP0808638 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [Y] 1-8, 11-12 * ; abstract; column 3, lines 13-22, 33-34, 54-55; column 4, lines 13-28; claim 1; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5997558 (NASH JOHN E [US]) [Y] 13 * ; abstract; figure 1; column 6, lines 10-24 *; | [Y]US6176871 (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US], et al) [Y] 7* ; figure 5; column 16, lines 41-52 *; | [Y]US2009318862 (ALI AFSAR [US], et al) [Y] 9, 10 * ; figure 9: paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]US7972299 (CARTER MATTHEW P [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5 * ; figure 4: column 5, lines 36.37 *; | [XY]US2012289971 (SEGERMARK JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1 * : figures 3, 3A; paragraphs [0037], [0040], [0046]-[0048]; claim 1 * [Y] 9-10, 13-14; | [Y]US8313493 (FISCHER FRANK J [US]) [Y] 1-8, 11-12 * ; abstract: figures 1, 4A, 4B; column 3, lines 21-22; column 6, lines 1-6, 52-56; column 8, lines 20-40 * |