EP3087378 - ADAPTER FOR MEASURING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKETT, Oliver John 29 St Johns Road Shildon Durham DL4 1LT / GB | 02 /
WILSON, Brian 16 Challacombe Crescent Ingleby Barwick Stockton-on-Tees Cleveland TS17 0NE / GB | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Bown, Mark Richard Johnson Matthey PLC Intellectual Property Department Belasis Avenue Billingham TS23 1LB / GB | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14821251.7 | 18.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014GB53768 | Priority number, date | GB20130022944 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: GB 201322944 | GB20140013804 | 04.08.2014 Original published format: GB 201413804 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015097452 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3087378 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3087378 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/04, G01N23/18, // G01N23/046 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
G01N23/18 (EP,GB,US);
G01D11/30 (GB);
G01B15/045 (GB);
G01N23/046 (EP,GB,US);
G01N2223/3303 (EP,GB,US);
G01N2223/628 (EP,GB,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | G01N23/18, G01N23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2016/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER FÜR EIN MESSINSTRUMENT | [2016/44] | English: | ADAPTER FOR MEASURING INSTRUMENT | [2016/44] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR INSTRUMENT DE MESURE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 31.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2014 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | IE | 18.12.2018 | LU | 18.12.2018 | MT | 18.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
MT | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 18.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 18.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2470077 (SHAWCOR LTD [CA]) [X] 1-4,8-10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraphs [0012] , [ 0033]; figure 1 * [I] 11; | [X]US5614720 (MORGAN IRA L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,12,14,15 * column 2, line 25 - line 31 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 23; figure 2 * * column 5, line 52 - line 66 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 22; figures 4A, 4B, 5 * * column 8, line 29 - line 34; figure 7 * * column 11, line 38 - line 54; figure 11 * * column 20, line 57 - column 21, line 7 *; | [XAI]GB2211708 (OIS ENGINEERING LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12,14,15 * page 1, last paragraph to page 2, paragraph 4; page 3; figure 1 * [A] 13 [I] 2; | [X]US2006048589 (LAVOIE ERIC [CA]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0018] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]WO2008127074 (HYUNDAI ENGINEERING & CONSTRUC [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,12,14,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraphs [0032] , [0 38]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 2 |