EP3082655 - LEAFLET-CUFF ATTACHMENTS FOR PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc. 177 East County Road B St. Paul, MN 55117 / US | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAIDO, Peter N. 21460 Heidelberg Street NE Linwood, Minnesota 55092 / US | 02 /
SCHRAUT, Julia A. 844 County Road I West Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | 03 /
FAHIM, Mina S. 5899 Hamlin Avenue North Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | 04 /
PARA, Andrea N. 5680 Hadley Avenue Apt. 226 Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Kent J. 680 White Birch Drive Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14821428.1 | 12.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US69886 | Priority number, date | US201361918305P | 19.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361918305 P | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094936 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082655 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3082655 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
A61F2/2418 (US);
A61F2/2442 (US);
A61F2/2445 (US);
A61F2/2469 (US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEGEL-MANSCHETTEN-AUFSÄTZE FÜR HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE | [2016/43] | English: | LEAFLET-CUFF ATTACHMENTS FOR PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE | [2016/43] | French: | FIXATIONS FEUILLET-MANCHON POUR VALVE CARDIAQUE PROTHÉTIQUE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 28.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Observations by third parties | 12.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2019 | Observations by third parties | 15.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19189166.2 / EP3583921 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2014 | AL | 15.01.2020 | AT | 15.01.2020 | CY | 15.01.2020 | CZ | 15.01.2020 | DK | 15.01.2020 | EE | 15.01.2020 | FI | 15.01.2020 | HR | 15.01.2020 | LT | 15.01.2020 | LV | 15.01.2020 | MC | 15.01.2020 | MK | 15.01.2020 | MT | 15.01.2020 | NL | 15.01.2020 | PL | 15.01.2020 | RO | 15.01.2020 | RS | 15.01.2020 | SE | 15.01.2020 | SI | 15.01.2020 | SK | 15.01.2020 | SM | 15.01.2020 | TR | 15.01.2020 | BG | 15.04.2020 | NO | 15.04.2020 | GR | 16.04.2020 | IS | 15.05.2020 | PT | 07.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AL | 15.01.2020 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
CY | 15.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
MT | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
TR | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
MC | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 15.01.2020 | |
CZ | 15.01.2020 | ||
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
PL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SI | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
EE | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 15.01.2020 | |
DK | 15.01.2020 | ||
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SK | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RO | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
SM | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 15.01.2020 | |
FI | 15.01.2020 | ||
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LT | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
IS | 15.05.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
BG | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
GR | 16.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
HR | 15.01.2020 | ||
LV | 15.01.2020 | ||
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
SE | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
RS | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
PT | 07.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 15.01.2020 | |
NL | 15.01.2020 | ||
NO | 15.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 15.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2008071361 (TUVAL YOSI [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0597] , [ 599]; figures 4C, 4E * [Y] 12,13,15-20; | [X]US2011319991 (HARITON ILIA [IL], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0058] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 4, 13, 14 *; | [XY]US2012123529 (LEVI TAMIR [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,14 * paragraphs [0075] - [0079] - [0081] - [0082]; figures 26,30 * [Y] 12,13,15-20; | [XY]EP2572676 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1-3,9,12,13 * paragraph [0186]; figures 74A, 76B, 77E, 77F, 77G * [Y] 15-20; | [XPL]WO2014004793 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US]) [XP] 1-4,6,9,11,14 * paragraphs [0076] , [0080]; figure 16A *[L] | by applicant | US7018406 | US7329278 | US2008147179 | US2008228264 | WO2009042196 |