EP3019689 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PUMP IN A DOWNHOLE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 The Hague / NL | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Kai 4835 Durham Lane Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 02 /
INDO, Kentaro 4310 Browning Court Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 03 /
POP, Julian 9550 Ella Lee Lane 2101 Houston, TX 77063 / US | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2019/43] |
Former [2016/20] | Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited Intellectual Property Law High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14822169.0 | 01.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014US45013 | Priority number, date | US201313937594 | 09.07.2013 Original published format: US201313937594 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015006093 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019689 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3019689 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/00, E21B43/12, E21B37/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
E21B47/06 (EP,US);
E21B49/082 (EP,US);
E21B49/0875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER PUMPE IN EINEM BOHRLOCHWERKZEUG | [2016/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PUMP IN A DOWNHOLE TOOL | [2016/20] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE POMPE DANS UN OUTIL DE FOND | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 12.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 01.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2014 | AL | 23.10.2019 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | IE | 01.07.2020 | LU | 01.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.07.2014 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
IE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02093126 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * pages 3, 4, 7 - page 17; figures 8, 9A, 9B *; | [A]US2004260497 (DIFOGGIO ROCCO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 44] , [0 45] , [0 53] , [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 62] , [0 63] - paragraphs [0065] , [0 66] , [0 68] , [0 70]; figures 7, 11, 12, 13A, 13B, 13C, 13D *; | [A]US2011042070 (HSU KAI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0017] , [0 20] , [0 21] , [0 30] , [0 42] , [0 49] , [0 51] , [0 52] - paragraphs [0056] , [0 57] , [0 58] , [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 73] , [0 76] , [0 78]; figures 1, 2A, 3A, 3B, 4A, 4B, 4C, 5B; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011049571 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 1, 2, 5 - pages 10, 12; figures 3, 5, 6 *; | [AP]WO2013184190 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [AP] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 20] , [0 22] , [0 23] , [0 24] , [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 30] , [0 31]; figures 1A, 1B, * | International search | [A]US2008040086 (BETANCOURT SORAYA S [US], et al); | [A]US2008083273 (SROKA STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2011218736 (PELLETIER MICHAEL T [US]); | [A]US2012018152 (ZUILEKOM ANTHONY H VAN [US], et al); | [A]US2012222852 (PELLETIER MICHAEL T [US]) |