EP3020020 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ifthisthen Inc. 535 Fifth Avenue Fourth Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENOVA, Michael, Angelo, III 1500 Broadway Suite 505 New York, NY 10036 / US | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Wilkinson, Marc George J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14822839.8 | 10.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014US46208 | Priority number, date | US201361844768P | 10.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361844768 P | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015006595 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3020020 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/10, G06F17/30 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
G06Q50/10 (EP,US);
G06N5/025 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06N5/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR WISSENSMANAGEMENT | [2016/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT | [2016/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DES CONNAISSANCES | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Anonymous, "Knowledge management - Wikipedia", (20130704), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Knowledge_management&oldid=562814253, (20161109), XP055317594 [I] 1-15 * page 4 * | International search | [Y]US5539869 (SPOTO THOMAS A [US], et al); | [Y]US5673369 (KIM MICHELLE YOONKYUNG [US]); | [A]KR20010084391 (KO SEUL NAM [KR]); | [Y]US2004044542 (BENIAMINY ISRAEL [IL], et al); | [A]US2005055321 (FRATKINA RAYA [US], et al); | [A]US2005086188 (HILLIS DANIEL W [US], et al); | [A]EP0915422 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |