EP3019693 - DETERMINING GEOMECHANICS COMPLETION QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:BE
CH
CY
EE
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
RS
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:AL
AT
BG
CZ
DE
DK
ES
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SI
SK
TR
Logined B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ S Gravenhage / NL | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERARD, Thomas 10A Red Lion Street Richmond TW9 1RW / GB | 02 /
DESROCHES, Jean Le Palatin 1 1, Cours du Triangle 92936 Paris La Défense / FR | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Somervell, Thomas Richard Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14823428.9 | 08.07.2014 | [2016/20] | WO2014US45811 | Priority number, date | US201361843589P | 08.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361843589 P | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015006363 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3019693 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, G01V11/00, G01V1/48, E21B43/26, G01V99/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G01V20/00 (EP,US);
G01V11/00 (EP,US);
G01V99/00 (EP,US);
G01V2210/646 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/20] | E21B47/00, G01V1/40, G01V1/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DER FERTIGSTELLUNGSQUALITÄT VON GEOMECHANIK | [2016/20] | English: | DETERMINING GEOMECHANICS COMPLETION QUALITY | [2016/20] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE QUALITÉ DE COMPLÉTION DE PUITS PAR LA GÉOMÉCANIQUE | [2016/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 29.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010111077 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *; | [XYI]EP2497900 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL]) [X] 1-6,11,14,16-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0051] , [0053] , [0055] , [0059] , [0060] * [Y] 7-9,13 [I] 10,12,15; | [Y]US2012325462 (ROUSSEL NICOLAS P [US], et al) [Y] 9,13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0039] , [0094] * | International search | [A]US2002091502 (MALTHE-SORENSSEN ANDERS [NO], et al); | [A]US2008183451 (WENG XIAOWEI [US], et al); | [A]US2010076738 (DEAN RICKY HOWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2011015909 (ZHAO GANG [CA]); | [X]US2012232872 (NASRELDIN GAISONI [GB], et al) |