EP3083014 - METHOD FOR REMOVING CARBON DIOXIDE FROM GAS MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCCALETTI, Giovanni Via Abele Merli 9 I-46037 Roncoferraro (MN) / IT | 02 /
COLOMBO, Roberta Via Bellini 19 I-20814 Varedo (MB) / IT | 03 /
CARSETTI, Valerio Via don Minzoni 2/7 I-20020 Arese (MI) / IT | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Benvenuti, Federica, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 14824419.7 | 16.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP77957 | Priority number, date | EP20130199031 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13199031 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015091477 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3083014 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3083014 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
B01D53/1475 (EP,US);
B01D53/1493 (US);
B01D53/1468 (US);
B01D2252/2025 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID AUS GASGEMISCHEN | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING CARBON DIOXIDE FROM GAS MIXTURES | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE PROVENANT DE MÉLANGES GAZEUX | [2017/27] |
Former [2016/43] | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE DE MÉLANGES GAZEUX | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 22.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2014 | AL | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | LU | 16.12.2017 | MT | 16.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004053167 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-3,11 *; | [A]FR2923728 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 14, line 4 - page 14, line 10; claims 1,8,11 *; | [A]EP2189416 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0044] , [0048] , [0049] , [0070] *; | [A]EP2201994 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1,2,8 *; | [AD] - M.B. MILLER, D. CHEN, H. XIE, D.R. LUEBKE, J.K. JOHNSON, R.M. ENICK, "Solubility of CO2 in CO2-philic oligomers; COSMOtherm predictions and experimental results", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, (20090901), vol. 287, no. 1, pages 26 - 36, XP002723619 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fluid.2009.08.022 | [AD] - M.B. MILLER, D.R. LUEBKE, R.M. ENICK, "CO2-philic Oligomers as Novel Solvents for CO2 Absorption", ENERGY & FUELS, (20101025), vol. 24, pages 6214 - 6219, XP002723620 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef101123e |