EP3080224 - ADHESIVE FORMULATION AND CREPING METHODS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buckman Laboratories International, Inc 1256 North Mclean Boulevard Memphis, TN 38108-0305 / US | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Jian c/o Buckman Laboratories International Inc. 1256 North McLean Boulevard Memphis, TN 31808-0305 / US | 02 /
GLOVER, Daniel, F. c/o Buckman Laboratories International Inc. 1256 North McLean Boulevard Memphis, TN 38108-0305 / US | 03 /
COVARRUBIAS, Rosa c/o Buckman Laboratories International Inc. 1256 North McLean Boulevard Memphis, TN 38108-0305 / US | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2016/42] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14824615.0 | 05.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014US68676 | Priority number, date | US201361913950P | 10.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913950 P | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015088881 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080224 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3080224 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09J103/08, D21H17/55 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
D21H21/146 (EP,CN,US);
C09J103/08 (EP,CN,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L79/02 (EP,US);
C09J11/06 (CN);
C09J11/08 (CN);
D21H17/28 (EP,CN,US);
D21H17/55 (EP,CN,US);
D21H17/72 (EP,CN,US);
C08L2205/02 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J103/08, C08L29/04 (US,EP);
C09J103/08, C08L29/04, C08L91/00, C08K5/053 (CN);
C09J103/08, C08L79/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFFORMULIERUNG UND KREPPVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2016/42] | English: | ADHESIVE FORMULATION AND CREPING METHODS USING SAME | [2016/42] | French: | FORMULATION D'ADHÉSIF ET PROCÉDÉS DE CRÊPAGE L'UTILISANT | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2014 | AL | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | TR | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | IE | 05.12.2021 | LU | 05.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
TR | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 05.12.2014 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
IE | 05.12.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
LU | 05.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 23.06.2021 | |
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 23.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9514065 (REICHHOLD CHEMICALS INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO9833978 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]US2011271871 (HITCHCOCK RICHARD R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2926116 | US3301746 | US3640841 | US3879257 | US3926716 | US4063995 | US4112222 | US4300981 | US4304625 | US4440898 | US4501640 | US4528316 | US4684439 | US4788243 | US4883564 | US4886579 | US4994146 | US5025046 | US5179150 | US5187219 | US5234547 | US5246544 | US5326434 | US5370773 | US5374334 | US5382323 | US5437766 | US5468796 | US5487813 | US5490903 | US5633309 | US5660687 | US5846380 | US5888347 | US5902862 | US5942085 | US5944954 | US6465047 | US6991707 | US7404875 | US7718035 | US7943705 |