EP3079817 - HYDROCARBON AROMATIZATION CATALYST COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHOSH, Ashim Kumar 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 02 /
STEVENSON, Scott 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | 03 /
SULLIVAN, David 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 04 /
MIHUT, Corina 1600 Industrial Blvd Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 05 /
KULKARNI, Neeta 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 06 /
SIMMONS, Meghann 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | 07 /
MIER, Michael 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 14825506.0 | 11.12.2014 | [2016/42] | WO2014US69763 | Priority number, date | US201314105941 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: US201314105941 | [2016/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015089291 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3079817 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/04, B01J37/30, B01J21/08, B01J29/04, B01J29/44, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, C07C2/00, C10G35/095 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
B01J29/44 (EP,CN,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J29/047 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0207 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
B01J37/30 (EP,US);
C10G3/44 (EP,US);
C10G3/49 (EP,US);
C10G3/57 (EP,US);
C10G3/60 (EP,US);
C10G35/09 (EP,US);
C10G35/095 (EP,CN,US);
C10G45/70 (EP,US);
B01J2229/183 (CN);
B01J2229/186 (EP,US);
B01J2229/40 (EP,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
C10G2300/104 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Title | German: | KOHLENWASSERSTOFFAROMATISIERUNGSKATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG | [2016/42] | English: | HYDROCARBON AROMATIZATION CATALYST COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF FORMATION | [2016/42] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR D'AROMATISATION D'HYDROCARBURES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 10.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008255398 (STEVENSON SCOTT A [US], et al); | [A]US2011132804 (STEVENSON SCOTT [US], et al); | [X]US2013296625 (GHOSH ASHIM K [US], et al) | by applicant | US3702886 |