EP3021849 - NOVEL CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF PEMETREXED TROMETHAMINE SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. 8-2-337 Road No. 3 Banjara Hills Hyderabad, Telangana 500034 / IN | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADGOUD, Ramesh Kumar Flat No 406 Raju Luthra Towers Vivek Nagar Kukatpally Hyderabad Telangana 500072 / IN | 02 /
VASAM, Sridhar Kothagudem Village Sangem Mandal Warangal Telangana 506330 / IN | 03 /
MAKIREDDY, Siva Reddy Pakalapadu post Sattenapalli mandal Guntur Andhra Pradesh 522403 / IN | 04 /
GILLA, Goverdhan H.No 3-63/4/205 Gayatri Residency Gangaram Chandanagar Hyderabad Telangana 500050 / IN | 05 /
KUNHIMON, Syam Kumar Unniaran Thanka Nivas P.O. Nattika Thrissur Kerala 680572 / IN | 06 /
SHARMA, Sachin Village Trind P. O. Nagrota Bagwan Kangra Himachal Pradesh 176047 / IN | 07 /
DORNALA, Kumara Swamy H No. 3-198 Village: Ghattuppal Mandal: Chandoor Nalgonda Telangana 508253 / IN | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/41] |
Former [2016/21] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14826506.9 | 15.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014IB63123 | Priority number, date | IN2013CHE3180 | 16.07.2013 Original published format: IN 3180CH2013 | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/21] | IN2013CHE3180 | 16.07.2013 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015008221 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021849 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3021849 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C213/08 (US);
C07C215/10 (US);
C07B2200/13 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | A61K31/519, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON PEMETREXED-TROMETHAMIN-SALZEN | [2016/21] | English: | NOVEL CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF PEMETREXED TROMETHAMINE SALTS | [2016/21] | French: | NOUVELLES FORMES CRISTALLINES DE SELS DE TROMÉTHAMINE DE PEMETREXED | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2014 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.07.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2013179248 (FRESENIUS KABI ONCOLOGY LTD [IN]) [XP] 14 * Claims 1, 7, 16, 18, 23, 26; examples 06-09, 11, 12. *; | [E]WO2014198337 (SYNTHON BV [NL]) [E] 14* Claims; example 2. *; | [XP] - Anonymous, "PEMETREXED TROMETHAMINE SALTS AND ITS SOLID STATE FORMS THEREOF. IP.com Number: IPCOM000236645D.", (20140507), pages 1 - 26, An IP.com Prior Art Database Technical Disclosure., URL: http://priorart.ip.com/IPCOM/000236645, (20161117), XP055320637 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0432677 (UNIV PRINCETON [US]); | [A]CN1552713 (HENGRUI MEDICINE CO LTD JIANGS [CN]); | [A]WO2006136837 (ASTEX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2010030598 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al); | [Y]WO2011064256 (AZAD PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENTS AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2011319354 (LAYTON MARK E [US], et al); | [A]WO2012015810 (EAGLE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0432677 | US5344932 | WO0114379 | CN1552713 | CN1778802 | US7138521 | CN101033227 | WO2008021405 | WO2010031357 | CN101691371 | WO2011064256 | - CHARLES et al., Organic Process Research & Development, (19990000), vol. 3, pages 184 - 188 | - EDWARD et al., J. Med. Chem., (19920000), vol. 35, pages 4450 - 4454 |