EP3022365 - SELF-CLEANING TOILET ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AS IP Holdco LLC One Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHER, Christophe 1568 Millstone River Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
GROVER, David 26 Haines Road Stockton, New Jersey 08559 / US | 03 /
BARNDT, Ronald 258 East North Street Bethlehem, PA 18018 / US | 04 /
SEGGIO, Frank 11 Kimberly Drive Wayside, NJ 07712 / US | 05 /
MCHALE, James 48 Riverview Terrace Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 06 /
CICENAS, Chris 115 Glen Crossing Drive Pataskala, OH 43062 / US | 07 /
O'KELLY, Matthew 341 West 6th Avenue Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826567.1 | 15.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US46741 | Priority number, date | US201361846427P | 15.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361846427 P | US201361881948P | 24.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361881948 P | US201361908038P | 22.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361908038 P | US201461950038P | 08.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461950038 P | US201461980514P | 16.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461980514 P | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015009751 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022365 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/02, E03D9/03 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
E03D9/037 (EP,US);
E03D9/035 (EP,US);
E03D2009/028 (EP,US);
E03D2201/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | E03D9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND SYSTEM FÜR EINE SELBSTREINIGENDE TOILETTE | [2016/21] | English: | SELF-CLEANING TOILET ASSEMBLY AND SYSTEM | [2016/21] | French: | ENSEMBLE TOILETTES AUTONETTOYANTES ET SYSTÈME | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2016 | 31.07.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5152015 (FOURMAN ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1,34-44 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 36 * * column 4, lines 43-45, 58-63 * * column 5, lines 25-32,44-51 *; | [Y]US2007113331 (PROKOPENKO ALEKSANDR [US], et al) [Y] 1,34-44* figures 1-3 *; | [XY]WO2009105417 (HARRIS ROBERT [US]) [X] 38 * figures 16,20 * * page 20, paragraph last - page 21, paragraph second; claims 1-3 * * page 28, paragraphs e,f * [Y] 1,34-44 | International search | [A]US1688098 (TURNER); | [Y]US2745110 (LYSTER JR GEORGE); | [Y]US3913151 (KEIMIG RUSSELL EDWARD); | [Y]US5152015 (FOURMAN ROBERT [US]); | [A]US6279174 (CANDUSSO ALDO [IT]); | [Y]US2003106145 (TOMITA KATSUNORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004216221 (CHEN I-HSIEN [TW]); | [Y]US2007113331 (PROKOPENKO ALEKSANDR [US], et al); | [A]US2008052812 (JENSEN ROBERT M [US]); | [Y]US2009211003 (HARRIS ROBERT MARION [US]) | by applicant | US1688098 | US2745110 | US3913151 | US5152015 | US5542132 | US5608923 | US5729837 | US5745928 | US5867844 | US5913611 | US6279174 | US6321392 | US2003106145 | US6772450 | US2004216221 | US2007113331 | US2008052812 | WO2009105417 | US8095997 |