EP3022351 - CLOTHES DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/36] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu, Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Hongjun 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Jinwoo 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Sanghun 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826639.8 | 15.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014KR06399 | Priority number, date | KR20130083685 | 16.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130083685 | KR20140051051 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: KR 20140051051 | KR20140075040 | 19.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140075040 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015009034 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022351 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3022351 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20, // D06F58/26 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
D06F58/26 (EP,US);
D06F58/02 (EP,US);
D06F58/263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | D06F58/04, D06F58/02, D06F58/20, D06F58/26 | ||
Former IPC [2016/21] | D06F58/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHETROCKNER | [2016/21] | English: | CLOTHES DRYER | [2016/21] | French: | SÈCHE-LINGE | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 30.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2014 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | NO | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.07.2014 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.07.2014 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
NO | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2158602 (CALHOUN ERNEST N) [A] 1-6 * page 2, lines 51-74; figure 4 *; | [A]US2527013 (KJELGAARD BAYARD L) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US4485566 (VIVARES ALAIN [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 46-50; figure 1 *; | [XA]KR20060007470 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 7,8 * page 2, lines 24-27; figures 1, 2, 3 * * page 3, lines 19-23 * * page 4, lines 10-11 * [A] 9-15; | [X]KR20060065872 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 7,8 * figures 3, 5, 7, 9-11, 17 *; | [XA]US2008110044 (EHLERS GREGORY ALLEN [US]) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 1, 3, 4 * [A] 8-15; | [A]KR20090116108 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 7-15* paragraphs [0025] , [ 0027] - [0029] - [ 0034]; figures 3-6 *; | [XA]US2011041352 (HONG DAE YEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] - [ 0019] , [ 0021] - [0027] - [ 0052] , [ 0060] - [0063]; figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0083] * [A] 5,6; | [A]KR20110097125 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 7-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0035]; figure 3 *; | [XA]US2012017456 (GRUNERT KLAUS [DE]) [X] 7,8,10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figure 1 * [A] 9,11-15; | [A]US2012030960 (RYOO BYEONGJO [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0077] , [ 0118] , [ 148]; figures 1, 2, 12 *; | [XA]WO2013067837 (HAIER GROUP CORP [CN], et al) [X] 7,8 * figures 8, 10 * [A] 9-15; | [E]EP2778281 (HAIER GROUP CORP [CN], et al) [E] 7,8 * paragraphs [0048] - [0056]; figures 8, 10 * | International search | [A]US4485566 (VIVARES ALAIN [DE]); | [A]US4621438 (LANCIAUX FRANCIS [US]); | [A]US2006156767 (KIM JONG S [KR], et al); | [A]US2010132216 (KRAUSCH UWE-JENS [DE], et al); | [A]US2012030960 (RYOO BYEONGJO [KR], et al) |