EP3021895 - INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bigfoot Biomedical, Inc. 1561 Buckeye Dr. Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2019/09] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states Bigfoot Biomedical, Inc. 1561 Buckeye Drive Milpitas, CA 93035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTES, Mark C. 18300 Wakecrest Drive Malibu, California 90265 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2016/21] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14826694.3 | 17.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US47023 | Priority number, date | US201313946330 | 19.07.2013 Original published format: US201313946330 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015009928 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021895 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3021895 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/142 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61M5/14244 (EP,US);
A61M5/14546 (EP,US);
A61M5/14566 (US);
A61M5/158 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (US);
A61M2005/14268 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1586 (US);
A61M2205/3515 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3576 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | A61M5/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFUSIONSPUMPENSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2016/21] | English: | INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2016/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POMPE À PERFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 24.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2014 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | ES | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | IT | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 17.07.2019 | LU | 17.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.07.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.07.2014 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 17.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
ES | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 01.05.2019 | |
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007056592 (M2 MEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-9,13-15 * figures 1, 2, 11 * * page 6, lines 6, 13-30 * * page 7, lines 11-30 * * page 19, lines 12-15 * * page 25, lines 7-13 * * page 27, lines 13-14 * [I] 10-12; | [Y]WO2008089184 (DEKA PRODUCTS LP [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2011319813 (KAMEN DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,11 * figure 15 * * paragraphs [0144] , [ 146] * [Y] 7-9 [I] 12; | [A]US2012330270 (COLTON JOSHUA [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008198012 (KAMEN DEAN [US]); | [A]US2009177142 (BLOMQUIST MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2011105955 (YUDOVSKY DMITRY [US], et al); | [A]US2011163880 (HALFF LISA [US], et al); | [X]US2011319813 (KAMEN DEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012330270 (COLTON JOSHUA [US]) |