EP3022569 - APPLICATION SPECIFIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH INTEGRATED MAGNETIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InvenSense, Inc. 1745 Technology Drive San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLOYD, Stephen 1942 Collen Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
SHIN, Jong, IL 1946 Rosswood Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 03 /
SHIN, Jongwoo 2725 Camino Casa Buena Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Kenyon, Sarah Elizabeth Brockwood Services LLP Unit 4 Bridge Farm Botley Road Curbridge, Hampshire SO30 2HB / GB | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14826810.5 | 18.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US47322 | Priority number, date | US201361856560P | 19.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361856560 P | US201414149779 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: US201414149779 | US201414326926 | 09.07.2014 Original published format: US201414326926 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010105 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3022569 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/16, G01R33/02, H01L43/08, H01L43/12, H01L27/22, G01R33/038, G01R33/09, G01R33/12 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
G01R33/038 (EP,US);
H10B61/00 (EP,US);
G01D5/16 (EP);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
G01R33/1207 (EP,US);
H10B61/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | G01R33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSSPEZIFISCHE INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM MAGNETSENSOR | [2016/21] | English: | APPLICATION SPECIFIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT WITH INTEGRATED MAGNETIC SENSOR | [2016/21] | French: | CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ À APPLICATION SPÉCIFIQUE DOTÉ D'UN CAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE INTÉGRÉ | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 18.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1411365 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2006007728 (SUNDSTROM LANCE [US]); | [Y]CN102565727 (JIANGSU MULTIDIMENSION TECH CO); | [Y]CN202421483U (JIANGSU MULTIDIMENSION TECH CO); | EP2818884 [ ] (JIANGSU MULTIDIMENSION TECH CO [CN]) | International search | [A]US5843589 (HOSHIYA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2001015878 (VARGA LAJOS [HU], et al); | [A]US2003011944 (HOSOMI MASANORI [JP]); | [A]US2004014243 (DREWES JOEL A [US]); | [A]US2012012956 (SAITOH EIJI [JP], et al) |