EP3076783 - ALS INHIBITOR HERBICIDE TOLERANT MUTANT PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Agricultural Solutions Seed US LLC 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2019/11] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience NV J.E. Mommaertslaan 14 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
For all designated states Bayer CropScience LP Research Triangle Park 2 T.W. Alexander Drive Durham, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUITER, Rene Blauwe Steenstraat 72 9070 Heusden (Destelbergen) / BE | 02 /
HAIN, Rüdiger Dreieichstrasse 44 60594 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
JOHANN, Gerhard Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 24 51399 Burscheid / DE | 04 /
LABER, Bernd Graf-von-Stauffenberg-Strasse 12 65510 Idstein / DE | 05 /
LAMBERT, Bart Haiglaan 27 bus 4A 8900 Ieper / BE | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/41] | van Lipzig, Rosalinde Henrica Agnes, et al Bayer CropScience NV IP Department Technologiepark 38 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | Application number, filing date | 14827178.6 | 01.12.2014 | [2016/41] | WO2014EP76137 | Priority number, date | EP20130195366 | 02.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13195366 | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015082413 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076783 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/10, C12N15/82 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/8274 (EP,US);
A01H5/10 (EP,US);
A01H6/202 (EP,US);
A01N43/42 (US);
A01N43/50 (US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N43/90 (US);
A01N47/36 (US);
A01N47/38 (US);
A01N65/08 (US);
C12N15/8261 (US);
C12N15/8278 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | 04.07.2016 | ME | 04.07.2016 | Title | German: | HERBIZIDTOLERANTE MUTANTE PFLANZEN MIT ALS-HEMMER | [2016/41] | English: | ALS INHIBITOR HERBICIDE TOLERANT MUTANT PLANTS | [2016/41] | French: | PLANTES MUTANTES TOLÉRANTES AUX HERBICIDES INHIBITEURS D'ALS | [2016/41] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 23.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2019 | 10.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009046334 (CIBUS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,14,15,17-20,23-25,29,30,37,42-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]WO2013127766 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y] - WHALEY CORY M ET AL, "A new mutation in plant ALS confers resistance to five classes of ALS-inhibiting herbicides", WEED SCIENCE, (200703), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0043-1745, pages 83 - 90, XP009183038 [Y] 1-46 * abstract * * page 87, column r, line 30 - line 35 * * page 88, column r, line 7 - line 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1614/WS-06-082.1 | [Y] - ZHENG DANMAN ET AL, "Cross-resistance of horseweed (Conyza canadensis) populations with three different ALS mutations", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (201112), vol. 67, no. 12, pages 1486 - 1492, XP002736999 [Y] 1-46 * abstract * * page 1487, column l, line 9 - line 23 * * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.2190 |