EP3086935 - METHOD OF RETREADING TIRES USING A STITCHING ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/44] | METHOD FOR RETREADING A TYRE CASING USING A ROLLER | ||
[2018/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2016/44] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERINO LOPEZ, José Manufacture Francaise des Pneumatiques Michelin DGD/PI - F35 Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Redouté, Gilles Pierre Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2019/11] |
Former [2016/44] | Potdevin, Emmanuel Eric LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14828245.2 | 18.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014FR53414 | Priority number, date | FR20130063443 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1363443 | [2016/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015097374 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086935 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086935 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/56, B29D30/54 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
B29D30/54 (EP,US);
B29D30/56 (EP,US);
B29D2030/523 (US);
B29D2030/544 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | B29D30/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RUNDERNEUERUNG VON LUFTREIFEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ANDRUCKWALZE | [2018/36] | English: | METHOD OF RETREADING TIRES USING A STITCHING ROLLER | [2018/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECHAPAGE D'UNE ENVELOPPE DE PNEUMATIQUE AU MOYEN D'UN ROULEAU | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/44] | VERFAHREN ZUR RUNDERNEUERUNG EINER REIFENKARKASSE MITHILFE EINER WALZE | ||
Former [2016/44] | METHOD FOR RETREADING A TYRE CASING USING A ROLLER | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2014 | AL | 13.03.2019 | AT | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.12.2014 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.12.2014 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
AT | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3753821 (RAGEN B) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 17; figures 1,3-7 *; | [Y]US3989563 (SCHELKMANN WILHELM) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 55 - column 8, line 38; figures 1-6 * * column 6, line 30 - line 66 *; | [XA]US4088521 (NEAL DUWARD HARDING) [X] 11 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-10; | [A]US2011056603 (KOUTOKU KOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2953456 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 3* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2012192684 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2988644 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0127]; figures 1,2 * |