EP3024422 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF AN AIRWAY DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revent Medical, Inc. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 350 Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMPERSAUD, Charles, R. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 350 Newark, CA 94560 / US | 02 /
GILLIS, Edward, M. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 350 Newark, CA 94560 / US | 03 /
FOSTER, Michael, D. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 350 Newark, CA 94560 / US | 04 /
PEASE, Emmanuelle, F. 39899 Balentine Drive Suite 350 Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14829631.2 | 24.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014US48058 | Priority number, date | US201361857814P | 24.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361857814 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015013535 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024422 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56, A61B17/34, A61B17/24 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (US);
A61B17/24 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61F5/566 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00336 (EP,US);
A61B2017/248 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3411 (EP,US);
A61B2090/306 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | A61F5/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER ATEMWEGSSTÖRUNG | [2016/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF AN AIRWAY DISORDER | [2016/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLE DES VOIES RESPIRATOIRES | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4998912 (SCARBROUGH EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2010137905 (WEADOCK KEVIN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0080]; figure 17a *; | [Y]US2011166598 (GONAZLES DONALD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2012132214 (GILLIS EDWARD M [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0111]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170]; figure 44a *; | [A]US2013150714 (HOWLETT MICHAEL W [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]US5372600 (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al); | [A]US2009044814 (IANCEA OCTAVIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2010037901 (ROUSSEAU ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US2012132214 (GILLIS EDWARD M [US], et al); | [A]US2012180799 (PFLUEGER D RUSSELL [US], et al) |