EP3026920 - TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEPTION METHOD, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND RECEPTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [2019/44] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMA, Tadamasa c/o Panasonic Intellectual Prop. Mngt. Co., Ltd. IP Mngt Dept. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Prop. Mngt. Co., Ltd. IP Mngt Dept. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Prop. Mngt. Co., Ltd. IP Mngt Dept. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KATOU, Hisaya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Prop. Mngt. Co., Ltd. IP Mngt Dept. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14830237.5 | 22.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014JP03844 | Priority number, date | US201361858155P | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361858155 P | US201361862115P | 05.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361862115 P | US201361863041P | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863041 P | US201361880283P | 20.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361880283 P | US201361883251P | 27.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361883251 P | US201361890981P | 15.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361890981 P | US201361892539P | 18.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361892539 P | JP20140145344 | 15.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014145344 | [2016/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015011915 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3026920 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3026920 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/242, H04H60/13, H04N21/435, H04N21/462, H04N21/43, H04H20/18, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2665, H04N21/44, H04N21/488, H04N21/8543 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04N21/4302 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/44012 (EP,US);
H04N21/4888 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04H20/18 (EP,US);
H04H2201/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | H04N21/242, H04H60/13, H04N21/435, H04N21/462 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDEVERFAHREN UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN SOWIE SENDEVORRICHTUNG UND EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/22] | English: | TRANSMISSION METHOD AND RECEPTION METHOD, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND RECEPTION DEVICE | [2016/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | Translation filed | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 09.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19205604.2 / EP3641318 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2014 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | GB | 22.07.2020 | IE | 22.07.2020 | LU | 22.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.07.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
GB | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007118850 (BERTIN CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [A]US2007188656 (CHISAKA MASANOBU [JP]); | [A]WO2008084947 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]EP2498494 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [X]WO2013055164 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]WO2013061525 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2611051 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]); | [P]US2014090007 (OKUBO MASAFUMI [JP], et al); | US2014237536 [ ] (JANG YONG-SEOK [KR], et al) | International search | [X]WO2012099359 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]WO2012099399 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) | Examination | WO2008141341 | EP2178300 | KR20130038792 | US2014245371 |