EP3105043 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS TO KEEP A WORK PIECE SURFACE FREE FROM LIQUID ACCUMULATION WHILE PERFORMING LIQUID-JET GUIDED LASER BASED MATERIAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avonisys AG General-Guisan-Strasse 6 6303 Zug / CH | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Avonisys AG General-Guisan-Strasse 6 6303 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAEBELEIN, Jens Guenter Anton-Zigau-Str. 16 39040 Freienfeld Campo di Trens / IT | 02 /
HRIBAR, Jeroen Seeburgstrasse 41a 6006 Luzern / CH | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Leske, Thomas FROHWITTER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstr. 20 81679 München / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/51] | Petri, Lars GleimPetri Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Pleichertorstraße 30 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14830872.9 | 04.12.2014 | [2016/51] | WO2014IB66577 | Priority number, date | US201361915510P | 13.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361915510 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015087209 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3105043 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3105043 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23K103/16, B23K26/0622, B23K26/382, B23K26/06, B23K26/14, B23K26/146 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B23K26/146 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/142 (EP,KR,US);
B22D19/0072 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0608 (US);
B23K26/0622 (US);
B23K26/0648 (US);
B23K26/1462 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/1464 (KR,US);
B23K26/1482 (KR,US);
B23K26/38 (KR,US);
B23K26/389 (US);
B23P17/02 (US);
B29C33/10 (US);
B29C33/3842 (KR,US);
B29D30/02 (KR);
B29D30/0606 (US);
B29D30/0629 (KR,US);
B23K2103/16 (US);
B23K26/36 (EP);
B23P19/047 (US);
B29D2030/0613 (US);
B29D2030/0617 (US);
B29D2030/062 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
Y10T29/49721 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49996 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | B23K26/06, B23K26/14, B23K26/146 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | B23K26/146, B23K103/16, B23K26/0622, B23K26/382 | ||
Former IPC [2016/51] | B29D30/06, B29C33/38, B23K26/40, B23K26/06, B23K26/38, B23K26/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEWAHRUNG DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES WERKSTÜCKS FREI VON FLÜSSIGKEITSANSAMMLUNG BEI DER DURCHFÜHRUNG VON FLÜSSIGSTRAHLGEFÜHRTER LASERBASIERTER MATERIALBEARBEITUNG | [2016/51] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS TO KEEP A WORK PIECE SURFACE FREE FROM LIQUID ACCUMULATION WHILE PERFORMING LIQUID-JET GUIDED LASER BASED MATERIAL PROCESSING | [2016/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES PERMETTANT DE GARDER UNE SURFACE DE PIÈCE À TRAVAILLER EXEMPTE D'UNE ACCUMULATION DE LIQUIDE PENDANT LA RÉALISATION D'UN TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAU BASÉ SUR LASER GUIDÉ PAR JET DE LIQUIDE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 07.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20158419.0 / EP3677417 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2014 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.12.2014 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2000334590 (AMADA ENG CT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,12,13,17,18 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * [Y] 3,4,10,14,16,19 [I] 5-7,11,15,20; | [YD]EP1833636 (SYNOVA SA [CH]) [YD] 3,4,14,19* figure 1 *; | [XY]US2012074110 (ZEDIKER MARK S [US], et al) [X] 12,17 * paragraph [0336] - paragraph [0340]; figures 19-20A * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [Y] 10,16 | by applicant | EP1940579 | EP1833636 | US8859988 |