EP3027729 - ASSAY CARTRIDGE PROCESSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS AND ASSOCIATED ASSAY CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBIO Diagnostics Inc. 5603 Arapahoe Avenue Suite 1 Boulder, CO 80303 / US | For all designated states Givens, Monique 10458 Kiping Place Westminster, CO 80021 / US | For all designated states Rowley, Keagan B. 145 South 34th Street Boulder, CO 80305 / US | For all designated states Vogel, Kurt R. 3115 Bell Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | For all designated states Supon, Frank William 428 East Raintree Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | For all designated states Lochhead, Michael J. 2399 Kalmia Avenue Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIVENS, Monique 10458 Kiping Place Westminster, CO 80021 / US | 02 /
ROWLEY, Keagan, B. 145 South 34th Street Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 03 /
VOGEL, Kurt, R. 3115 Bell Drive Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 04 /
SUPON, Frank, William 428 East Raintree Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 05 /
LOCHHEAD, Michael, J. 2399 Kalmia Avenue Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14831349.7 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014US48620 | Priority number, date | US201361859717P | 29.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361859717 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015017413 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027729 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, B01F11/00, B01F11/02, B01F13/08, B01L3/00, B01F15/00, G01N1/38 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
B01F31/86 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (US);
B01F31/24 (US);
B01F33/452 (US);
B01F35/2209 (EP,US);
B01F35/22161 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L3/502723 (US);
B01L2200/06 (US);
B01L2200/14 (US);
B01L2300/02 (US);
B01L2300/0672 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | C12M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | TESTKASSETTENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE TESTKASSETTEN | [2016/23] | English: | ASSAY CARTRIDGE PROCESSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS AND ASSOCIATED ASSAY CARTRIDGES | [2016/23] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE CARTOUCHES DE DOSAGE ET CARTOUCHES DE DOSAGE ASSOCIÉES | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0035762 (CLINICON AB [SE]) [I] 1,5 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, lines 20-22 * * page 6, lines 18-27 * * page 7, lines 16-24 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO0076642 (PROVALIS DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,10-13 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraphs 1-7 * * page 5, paragraph 5 * * page 13, paragraph 4 * * page 15, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 16, paragraphs 1,4 - page 17, line 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1354623 (RANDOX LAB LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * figures 4,6 *; | [X]WO2007106552 (MICRONICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10,12,13 * page 3, lines 14-26 * * page 16, lines 13-37 * * page 17, lines 31-36 * * page 19, lines 17-24 * * figures 5,6,12 *; | [XI]WO2012145730 (MESA TECH INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8,14 * page 4, lines 8-10 * * page 4, lines 14-16 * * page 4, lines 27-29 * * page 5, lines 19-20 * * page 13, lines 4-14 * * page 17, lines 21-26 * * page 17, lines 15-26 * * page 19, lines 19-20 * * page 22, lines 28-30 * * figures 1, 15 *[I] 9,15 | International search | [A]US5192506 (KURESHY FAREED [US], et al); | [Y]US5222808 (SUGARMAN JEFFREY [US], et al); | [A]US5627041 (SHARTLE ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US2006257945 (MASTERS BRETT P [US], et al); | [Y]US2011203367 (HUANG MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]WO2012145730 (MESA TECH INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2013130262 (BATTRELL C FREDERICK [US], et al); | [X]US2013189794 (EMERIC PIERRE [US], et al) |