EP3029196 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/23] | CABLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC CABLE | ||
[2019/24] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braskem S.A. Rua Eteno 1561 Complexo Petroquímico de Camaçari 42810-000 Camaçari - BA / BR | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUENO, Marcos, Roberto, Paulino Rua Praia de Tambau Quadra 20 - Lote 03 Condomínio Tahiti Apto TT103 Bairro Vilas do Atlântico 42700-000 Lauro Freitas - BA / BR | 02 /
PENAQUIONI, André Rua Avenida Sul 492 Bairro Inocop 42801-070 Camaçari - BA / BR | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14831472.7 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014BR00255 | Priority number, date | US201361859436P | 29.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361859436 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015013790 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | PT | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029196 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D07B7/16, D07B1/18 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
D07B1/185 (EP,US);
D07B1/02 (US);
D07B1/18 (US);
D07B3/00 (EP,US);
D07B5/00 (US);
D07B7/16 (US);
D07B7/167 (EP,US);
D07B7/169 (US);
D07B1/025 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2033 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2034 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2098 (EP,US);
D07B5/002 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | D07B1/04, D07B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SYNTHETISCHEN SEILS | [2019/24] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC CABLE | [2019/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CÂBLE SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2019/24] |
Former [2016/23] | KABEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SYNTHETISCHEN KABELS | ||
Former [2016/23] | CABLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SYNTHETIC CABLE | ||
Former [2016/23] | CÂBLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CÂBLE SYNTHÉTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2016 | Translation filed | 29.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BR | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 17.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2016 | 31.07.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012297745 (STOUT ADRIANUS [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0076] , [0083] , [0088] - [0090] *; | [XY]US2013145740 (SCHULZ NEIL [GB]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0066] , [0071] , [0073] - [0076] - [0079] - [0081]; figures 1,1A,5,6 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Samson Splicing Instructions", (20130626), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130626074856/http://www.samsonrope.com/Documents/Splice Instructions/Lock Stitching Whipping Seizing Procedures_SEPT2012_WEB.pdf, (20161220), XP055330413 [Y] 2,5 * the whole document * | [AP] - Anonymous, "Splicing Instructions - Whipping", (20161220), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20161220081502/http://www.cortlandcompany.com/sites/default/files/downloads/media/splicing-instructions-whipping-instructions_0.pdf, (20161220), XP055330416 [AP] 2 * page 5, paragraph 22 * | International search | [A]GB2155068 (LATCHWAY MARINE); | [A]JPH09158072 (TOKYO SEIKO CO LTD); | [X]WO2011083126 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al); | [X]JP2013002010 (STAS CO LTD) | by applicant | US3899206 | US4534163 | US5136755 | WO2011083126 | WO2012139934 |