EP3093793 - FINGERPRINT IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad de Sevilla Vicerrectorado de Transferencia Tecnológica Paseo de las Delicias s/n Pabellón de Brasil 41013 Sevilla / ES | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARJONA LÓPEZ, Mª Rosario Dpto. Electrónica y Electromagnetismo Facultad de Física Avda. Reina Mercedes s/n E-41012 Sevilla / ES | 02 /
BATURONE CASTILLO, Mª Iluminada Dpto. Electrónica y Electromagnetismo Facultad de Física Avda. Reina Mercedes s/n E-41012 Sevilla / ES | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14832457.7 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/46] | WO2014ES00131 | Priority number, date | ES20130000721 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: ES 201300721 | [2016/46] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015015022 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | ES | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3093793 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G06V40/1359 (EP);
G06V40/1347 (EP);
G06V40/1365 (EP);
G06V40/1376 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKIDENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2016/46] | English: | FINGERPRINT IDENTIFICATION METHOD AND DEVICE USING SAME | [2016/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES ET DISPOSITIF METTANT EN OEUVRE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2016 | Translation filed | 08.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 08.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ROSARIO ARJONA ET AL, "Model-based design for selecting fingerprint recognition algorithms for embedded systems", ELECTRONICS, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ICECS), 2012 19TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121209), doi:10.1109/ICECS.2012.6463556, ISBN 978-1-4673-1261-5, pages 579 - 582, XP032331594 [I] 1-15 * Section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECS.2012.6463556 | [A] - ROSARIO ARJONA ET AL, "A digital circuit for extracting singular points from fingerprint images", ELECTRONICS, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ICECS), 2011 18TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111211), doi:10.1109/ICECS.2011.6122353, ISBN 978-1-4577-1845-8, pages 627 - 630, XP032095122 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECS.2011.6122353 | [A] - KULKARNI J V ET AL, "Orientation feature for fingerprint matching", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, vol. 39, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2006.03.007, ISSN 0031-3203, (20060801), pages 1551 - 1554, (20060801), XP028055653 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2006.03.007 | [A] - SADEGH HELFROUSH ET AL, "Nonminutiae-Based Decision-Level Fusion for Fingerprint Verification", EURASIP JOURNAL ON APPLIED SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20070101), vol. 2007, no. 1, doi:10.1155/2007/60590, ISSN 1687-6180, page 060590, XP055408411 [A] 1-15 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2007/60590 | International search | [A] - ARJONA, R. ET AL., "A digital circuit for extracting singular points from fingerprint images.", 18TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRONICS, CIRCUITS, AND SYSTEMS, (ICECS 2011, (20111214), pages 627 - 630, XP032095122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECS.2011.6122353 | [A] - ARJONA, R. ET AL., "Model-based design for selecting fingerprint recognition algorithms for embedded systems.", 19TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRONICS, CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ICECS 2012), (20121212), pages 579 - 582, XP032331594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICECS.2012.6463556 | [A] - PORWIK, P. ET AL., "A new approach to reference point location in fingerprint recognition.", EICE ELECTRONICS EXPRESS, (20041225), vol. 1, no. 18, pages 575 - 581, XP055317694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/elex.1.575 | [A] - JAIN. A. K. ET AL., "Filterbank-based fingerprint matching.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200505), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 846 - 859, XP055244833 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.841531 | [A] - TICO, M. ET AL., "Fingerprint recognition using wavelet features .", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (ISCAS 2001), (20010509), vol. 2, pages 21 - 24, XP010540568 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.2001.920996 | [A] - YANG, J. C. ET AL., "A fingerprint verification algorithm using tessellated invariant moment features.", NEUROCOMPUTING, (20080601), vol. 71, no. 10-12, pages 1939 - 1946, XP022703790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neucom.2007.12.034 | [A] - PARK, C-H. ET AL., "Directional filter bank-based fingerprint feature extraction and matching.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (20040101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 74 - 85, XP001186972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.818355 | by applicant | CN102495886 | WO2008135521 | WO2008098357 | US2004062426 | US2005058325 | US6185318 | US6181807 | WO9532482 | CN101620677 | CN102368242 | CN101996318 | US7136514 | GB2320352 | US2008223925 | US8276816 |