EP3172386 - LOCKING HINGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lift Link Housing Pty Ltd 74A Buckingham Street Surry Hills, NSW 2010 / AU | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOWREY, Ian 74A Buckingham Street Surry Hills Sydney, New South Wales 2010 / AU | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Ashton, Gareth Mark, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 14832744.8 | 22.07.2014 | [2017/22] | WO2014AU50141 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015013757 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172386 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/344, E04H12/18, E01F9/646, E05D11/10, E04C3/00, E05D3/18, E05D5/02, F16C11/10, E05D3/02 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
E04B1/344 (EP,US);
F16C11/10 (US);
E04C3/005 (EP,US);
E05D11/1007 (EP,US);
E05D3/02 (EP,US);
E05D3/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | E04B1/344, E04H12/18, E01F9/646, E05D11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSSCHARNIERE | [2017/22] | English: | LOCKING HINGES | [2017/22] | French: | CHARNIÈRES DE VERROUILLAGE | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/30] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1138890 (HARSCO CORP) [X] 1,7,8,10-13 * page 2, line 7 - line 117; figures 1-5 *[A] 2-6,9,14-18; | [XA]US5441359 (FILIPPI GEORGE C [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10-13 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-6,9,14-18; | [XA]US2005089362 (LIN JONG-TE [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,10-14 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-6 * [A] 5-9,15-18 | International search | [A]US4286353 (ROCHE JOHN N); | [X]US5441359 (FILIPPI GEORGE C [US]); | [A]WO03029581 (FLUDE RODGER ELLIS [GB]); | [A]WO2013044301 (LIFT LINK HOUSING PTY LTD [AU]) | by applicant | GB1138890 | US5441359 | US7029197 |