EP3032309 - ZOOM LENS, OPTICAL APPARATUS AND ZOOM LENS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Daisaku c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chrome Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
KURASHIGE, Takamichi c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chrome Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14834235.5 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014JP04084 | Priority number, date | JP20130165710 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013165710 | JP20130165711 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013165711 | JP20130165712 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013165712 | JP20130165799 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013165799 | JP20130165800 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013165800 | [2016/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015019604 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032309 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/14, G02B13/18, G02B15/20 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G02B15/144113 (EP,US);
G02B13/009 (US);
G02B13/18 (EP,US);
G02B15/144105 (EP,US);
G02B15/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G02B15/20, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | ZOOMOBJEKTIV, OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ZOOMOBJEKTIVHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/24] | English: | ZOOM LENS, OPTICAL APPARATUS AND ZOOM LENS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2016/24] | French: | OBJECTIF À FOCALE VARIABLE, APPAREIL OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'OBJECTIF À FOCALE VARIABLE | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2016 | Translation filed | 09.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 27.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008102165 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [XI]US2009168195 (WATANABE MASAHITO [JP]) | International search | [X]JP2008102165 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2009075581 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2009133993 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2009139701 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2009186983 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP); | [X]JP2012113296 (KOFUKIN SEIMITSU KOGYO, et al); | [X]JP2012252254 (CANON KK); | [X]US2013194465 (KIMURA TOMONORI [JP]) | by applicant | JP2012093761 | JP2012113296 |