EP3030783 - ELECTRONIC PUMP MOTOR CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graco Minnesota Inc. 88 11th Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55413-1894 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAPHAKE, Andrew, J. 227 E. Diamond Lake Road Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | 02 /
MJOLHUS, Eric, J. 5649 157th Avenue N.W. Ramsey, Minnesota 55303 / US | 03 /
NIJAGUNA, Suresha, S. 5388 60th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55446 / US | 04 /
LANIE, Jesse, L. 113 Mable Street Ihlen, Minnesota 56140 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
KLAPHAKE, Andrew, J. 227 E. Diamond Lake Road Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419 / US | ||
02 /
MJOLHUS, Eric, J. 5649 157th Avenue N.W. Ramsey, Minnesota 55303 / US | |||
03 /
NIJAGUNA, Suresha, S. 14300 34th Avenue N. Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | |||
04 /
LANIE, Jesse, L. 113 Mable Street Ihlen, Minnesota 56140 / US | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14834954.1 | 07.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US50103 | Priority number, date | US201361863334P | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863334 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021252 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030783 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06, F04B53/18 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
F04B49/06 (EP,US);
F16N7/38 (RU);
F16N37/00 (US);
F01M1/02 (US);
F01M11/0004 (RU,US);
F01M11/02 (RU);
F01M11/06 (RU);
F04B17/03 (EP,US);
F04B19/22 (US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B53/18 (EP,US);
F04C14/00 (US);
F04C15/008 (US);
F04C2/08 (US);
F16N11/00 (EP);
F16N11/08 (EP);
F16N13/00 (US);
F16N13/06 (EP,US);
F16N19/003 (US);
F16N21/00 (US);
F16N29/00 (US);
F16N29/02 (EP,US);
F16N31/02 (US);
F16N7/40 (US);
G01F23/22 (US);
G01F23/40 (US);
F01M2001/0215 (US);
F01M2001/023 (US);
F01M2001/0238 (US);
F01M2001/0253 (US);
F04B2203/0201 (EP,US);
F16N19/00 (EP,US);
F16N2013/063 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE PUMPENMOTORREGELUNG | [2016/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC PUMP MOTOR CONTROL | [2016/24] | French: | COMMANDE DE MOTEUR DE POMPE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 05.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012063922 (SANO YUKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2012132305 (CONLEY PAUL G [US]); | [A]US2012213645 (LUMSDEN JOHN L [US], et al); | [X]WO2013100017 (JTEKT CORP [JP]); | EP2799714 [ ] (JTEKT CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]US4505405 (KELLY LAWRENCE S [US], et al); | [A]US5181585 (BRAUN DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]JPH1113485 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]US8424722 (KOCH D CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2013168187 (CONLEY PAUL G [US], et al) |