EP3030873 - FLEXIBLE TEMPERATURE SENSOR INCLUDING CONFORMABLE ELECTRONICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MC10, INC. 10 Maguire Road, Building 3 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Sanjay 50 Robinson Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | 02 /
DOWLING, Kevin J. 2139 Le Gran Drive Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 03 /
KACYVENSKI, Isaiah 13 Highland Street Weston, Massachusetts 02493 / US | 04 /
CERUOLO, Melissa 209 Lawrence Street Methuen, Massachusetts 01844 / US | 05 /
IVES, Barry G. 11 Glenforest Drive Voorhees, New Yersey 08043 / US | 06 /
LI, Xia 11 Middlesex Street, Unit A Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
GUPTA, Sanjay 50 Robinson Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | ||
02 /
DOWLING, Kevin J. 23 Village View Road Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US | |||
03 /
KACYVENSKI, Isaiah 13 Highland Street Weston, Massachusetts 02493 / US | |||
04 /
CERUOLO, Melissa 209 Lawrence Street Methuen, Massachusetts 01844 / US | |||
05 /
IVES, Barry G. 11 Glenforest Drive Voorhees, New Yersey 08043 / US | |||
06 /
LI, Xia 11 Middlesex Street, Unit A Wakefield, Massachusetts 01880 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk (Luxembourg) LLP 44, rue de la Vallée 2661 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Watterson, Peer Marten John Marks & Clerk (Luxembourg) LLP 44 rue de la Vallée B.P. 1775 1017 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 14835387.3 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US49769 | Priority number, date | US201361862448P | 05.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361862448 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021039 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030873 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01K13/00, G01K1/14, A61B5/00, H04L12/28, F24F11/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G01K13/20 (EP,US);
G08B21/02 (US);
A61B5/0004 (EP,US);
A61B5/0008 (EP,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/015 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,US);
A61B5/7282 (EP,US);
A61B5/74 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
G01K1/14 (EP,US);
G01K1/143 (US);
G08B3/10 (US);
H04L12/2818 (US);
H04L12/2827 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0242 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0412 (EP,US);
A61B2562/02 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0271 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B2562/12 (EP,US);
A61B2562/164 (EP,US);
A61B2562/166 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (EP,US);
A61B5/0531 (EP,US);
A61B5/0537 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G01K13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER TEMPERATURSENSOR MIT KONFORMER ELEKTRONIK | [2016/24] | English: | FLEXIBLE TEMPERATURE SENSOR INCLUDING CONFORMABLE ELECTRONICS | [2016/24] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE SOUPLE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES CONFORMABLES | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 04.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009105605 (ABREU MARCIO MARC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0263] * * paragraph [0499]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0684] - paragraph [0686]; figure 83 * [Y] 2-4,6,9-11; | [Y]US2012094638 (SHAMOON CHARLES G [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,9-11* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2007206655 (HASLETT JAMES W [CA], et al); | [Y]US2011213559 (POLLACK RICHARD S [US], et al); | [Y]US2012029308 (PAQUET PIERRE [CA]); | [Y]US2012094638 (SHAMOON CHARLES G [US], et al) |