EP3250116 - CONTACT THERMO-OPTICAL STRUCTURE AND ITS APPLICATION IN DETECTION OF ALLERGIC REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/49] | CONTACT THERMO-OPTICAL STRUCTURE AND ITS APPLICATION FOR NON-INVASIVE IMAGING OF HISTAMINE-INDUCED HYPERTHERMAL SUBCUTANEOUS REACTION MAGNITUDE IN CUTANEOUS ALLERGIC REACTION, RECORDING DEVICE AND METHOD OF ALLERGIC REACTION DIAGNOSIS | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexus Ekspertyzy I Badania Dr Jacek Stepien Organistow 19 02-857 Warszawa / PL | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPIEN, Jacek Organistow 19 PL-02-857 Warszawa / PL | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. Ul. Emilii Plater 53 21st Floor 00-113 Warsaw / PL | ||
Former [2017/49] | Dobrzanski, Jan Pawel AOMB Polska Sp. z o.o. ul. Emilii Plater 53 21st floor 00-113 Warsaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 14835677.7 | 30.12.2014 | [2017/49] | WO2014IB67418 | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108071 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3250116 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3250116 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/01, A61B5/00, G01K11/16, G01K13/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/015 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/445 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/6833 (KR,US);
A61B90/361 (KR,US);
G01K11/165 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOOPTISCHE KONTAKTSTRUKTUR UND DEREN ANWENDUNG BEI DER ERKENNUNG VON ALLERGISCHEN REAKTIONEN | [2017/49] | English: | CONTACT THERMO-OPTICAL STRUCTURE AND ITS APPLICATION IN DETECTION OF ALLERGIC REACTIONS | [2020/26] | French: | STRUCTURE THERMO-OPTIQUE DE CONTACT ET SON APPLICATION POUR IMAGERIE NON-INVASIVE D'AMPLITUDE DE RÉACTION SOUS-CUTANÉE HYPERTHERMIQUE INDUITE PAR L'HISTAMINE DANS UNE RÉACTION ALLERGIQUE CUTANÉE, DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE RÉACTION ALLERGIQUE | [2017/49] |
Former [2017/49] | CONTACT THERMO-OPTICAL STRUCTURE AND ITS APPLICATION FOR NON-INVASIVE IMAGING OF HISTAMINE-INDUCED HYPERTHERMAL SUBCUTANEOUS REACTION MAGNITUDE IN CUTANEOUS ALLERGIC REACTION, RECORDING DEVICE AND METHOD OF ALLERGIC REACTION DIAGNOSIS | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 30.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2014 | AL | 14.10.2020 | AT | 14.10.2020 | CY | 14.10.2020 | CZ | 14.10.2020 | DK | 14.10.2020 | EE | 14.10.2020 | ES | 14.10.2020 | FI | 14.10.2020 | HR | 14.10.2020 | IT | 14.10.2020 | LT | 14.10.2020 | LV | 14.10.2020 | MC | 14.10.2020 | MK | 14.10.2020 | MT | 14.10.2020 | NL | 14.10.2020 | RO | 14.10.2020 | RS | 14.10.2020 | SE | 14.10.2020 | SI | 14.10.2020 | SK | 14.10.2020 | SM | 14.10.2020 | TR | 14.10.2020 | IE | 30.12.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 14.01.2021 | NO | 14.01.2021 | GR | 15.01.2021 | IS | 14.02.2021 | PT | 15.02.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 30.12.2014 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MK | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.12.2014 | |
AL | 14.10.2020 | ||
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CY | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
MT | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
TR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SI | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
IT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 14.10.2020 | |
AT | 14.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
MC | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
DK | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
EE | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RO | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SK | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
CZ | 14.10.2020 | ||
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LT | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
SM | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
HR | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
ES | 14.10.2020 | ||
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
IS | 14.02.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 14.10.2020 | |
FI | 14.10.2020 | ||
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
BG | 14.01.2021 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
LV | 14.10.2020 | ||
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
SE | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
GR | 15.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
RS | 14.10.2020 | ||
NO | 14.01.2021 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 14.10.2020 | |
NL | 14.10.2020 | ||
PT | 15.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 14.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4302971 (LUK CATHERINE M) [X] 1-3,5,12-14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 39 - column 6, line 59 * [A] 25-37 [I] 4,7-11,15-23; | [A]WO2006086001 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0018] ** paragraphs [0030] - [0033] *; | [XAYI]WO2008082318 (STEPIEN JACEK [PL], et al) [X] 1,2,6,12-14,20 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 12, line 16 - page 14, line 33 * * page 22, line 33 - page 26, line 5 * [A] 25-32 [Y] 33-37 [I] 3-5,7-11,15-19,21-24; | [Y]US2012316458 (RAHMAN HOSAIN SADEQUR [US], et al) [Y] 33-37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030]; figures 1, 5A-5D * * paragraphs [0050] - [0054] *; | [IA]WO2013118067 (BRASTER SA [PL]) [I] 25-32 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 3 * * page 11, line 11 - page 14, line 22 * [A] 1-24,33-37 | Examination | US4030482 | - ABDULLAH N ET AL, "Film thickness effects on calibrations of a narrowband thermochromic liquid crystal", EXPERIMENTAL THERMAL AND FLUID SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 33, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.EXPTHERMFLUSCI.2008.12.002, ISSN 0894-1777, (20090401), pages 561 - 578, (20081216), XP026067541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.expthermflusci.2008.12.002 | by applicant | US3441513 | US4301023 | WO8400608 | US4547309 | EP0189381 | US4720301 | EP0404639 | US5219625 | US5480482 | US5508068 | US5558700 | US5591255 | US5997849 | US6120701 | US6139779 | US6204900 | US6485824 | US6494950 | US2005104043 | US7278369 | US7332109 | US7494537 | US2009278090 | EP2138550 | US2013146811 | US2014037362 | - S. Y. T. TZENG ET AL., "Thermal tuning band gap in cholesteric liquid crystals", LIQUID CRYSTALS, (2010), vol. 37, no. 9 | - BERNSTEIN I.L.; BLESSING-MOORE J.; COX L.S.; LANG D.M.; NICKLAS R.A. ET AL., "Allergy Diagnostic Testing: An Updated Practice Parameter", ANN. ALLEGRY, (2008), vol. 121, no. 8 |