EP3043686 - VAPOR GENERATOR INCLUDING WIRE MESH HEATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Luca Oven Technologies, LLC Suite 2450 101 California Street San Francisco, California 94111 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LUCA, Nicholas P. PO Box 5337-8202 Carmel by the Sea, California 93921 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/41] |
Former [2016/29] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14836083.7 | 14.08.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US51116 | Priority number, date | US201361865610P | 14.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361865610 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015023874 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043686 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3043686 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/086, A47J27/04 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
A47J27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFERZEUGER MIT EINEM DRAHTGITTER-HEIZELEMENT | [2016/29] | English: | VAPOR GENERATOR INCLUDING WIRE MESH HEATING ELEMENT | [2016/29] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE VAPEUR COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE CHAUFFAGE EN MAILLE MÉTALLIQUE | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/29] | 04.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 08.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2016 | Decision despatched | 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2014 | AL | 07.10.2020 | AT | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | NL | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.08.2014 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 14.08.2014 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 14.08.2014 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
NL | 07.10.2020 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH08121701 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0037]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]JPH09126474 (KORANSHA KK) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]CN2337903Y (HE JIANGUO [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2505656 (WAGNER MARTIN N); | [Y]US3949743 (SHANBROM EDWARD); | [Y]US5408574 (DEEVI SEETHARAMA C [US], et al); | [Y]US2003108343 (BUZZI BRUNO [IT]); | [Y]US2006222351 (CEZAYIRLI CEM [US], et al); | [Y]US2008053383 (VARACINS ALAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2010242316 (WIELSTRA YTSEN [NL]); | [A]US2012161747 (ROUX JEAN-MAXIME [FR]); | [Y]US2013081582 (VARGA CHRISTOPHER M [US]); | [A]US2013104916 (BELLINGER JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US8498526 (DE LUCA NICHOLAS P [US]) | by applicant | JPH08121701 |