EP3033611 - METHOD OF TRACING CHEMICAL QUANTITIES USING ENCAPSULATED FLUORESCENT DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 370 N. Wabasha Street St. Paul, Minnesota 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Lan 2520 Dewes Lane Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | 02 /
XIE, Yanjiao 5201 Carriage Way Drive Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14836331.0 | 04.08.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014US49624 | Priority number, date | US201313964478 | 12.08.2013 Original published format: US201313964478 | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015023466 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033611 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033611 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/77, C02F1/52, G01N33/18, // C02F5/00, C02F103/02, C02F103/28, C02F103/36, C02F103/10, C02F1/50, C02F1/54, C02F1/56 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/18 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (US);
C02F1/5209 (EP,US);
G01N21/643 (US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/54 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F2103/023 (EP,US);
C02F2103/10 (EP,US);
C02F2103/28 (EP,US);
C02F2103/365 (EP,US);
C02F2303/08 (EP,US);
C02F2305/00 (EP,US);
C02F2305/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/25] | G01N21/64, G01N21/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERFOLGUNG CHEMISCHER GRÖSSEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINGEKAPSELTER FLUORESZENZFARBSTOFFE | [2016/25] | English: | METHOD OF TRACING CHEMICAL QUANTITIES USING ENCAPSULATED FLUORESCENT DYES | [2016/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAÇAGE DE QUANTITÉS DE SUBSTANCES CHIMIQUES UTILISANT DES COLORANTS FLUORESCENTS ENCAPSULÉS | [2016/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2014 | AL | 17.02.2021 | AT | 17.02.2021 | CY | 17.02.2021 | CZ | 17.02.2021 | DK | 17.02.2021 | EE | 17.02.2021 | ES | 17.02.2021 | FI | 17.02.2021 | HR | 17.02.2021 | IT | 17.02.2021 | LT | 17.02.2021 | LV | 17.02.2021 | MC | 17.02.2021 | NL | 17.02.2021 | PL | 17.02.2021 | RO | 17.02.2021 | RS | 17.02.2021 | SE | 17.02.2021 | SI | 17.02.2021 | SK | 17.02.2021 | SM | 17.02.2021 | BG | 17.05.2021 | NO | 17.05.2021 | GR | 18.05.2021 | IS | 17.06.2021 | PT | 17.06.2021 | GB | 04.08.2021 | IE | 04.08.2021 | LU | 04.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | FR | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 04.08.2014 | |
AL | 17.02.2021 | ||
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
GB | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
GB | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
FR | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
IT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
MC | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SI | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.02.2021 | |
AT | 17.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
ES | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RO | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SK | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
DK | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
CZ | 17.02.2021 | ||
EE | 17.02.2021 | ||
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 17.02.2021 | |
FI | 17.02.2021 | ||
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
SM | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
IS | 17.06.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
PL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
NL | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
SE | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
LV | 17.02.2021 | ||
RS | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
BG | 17.05.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
GR | 18.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
HR | 17.02.2021 | ||
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 17.02.2021 | |
LT | 17.02.2021 | ||
NO | 17.05.2021 | ||
PT | 17.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5808103 (WARD WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008305157 (ENGLISH DOUGLAS S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2010140032 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 7 * * page 6, line 14 - line 26 * * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 25 * * page 12, line 17 - page 15, line 6 * * page 18, line 5 - page 20, line 8 * * examples 1-8 * [I] 4,6-9,12,13,15; | [XI]US2010330366 (KEISER BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] * [I] 3,4,7-9,11-13,15 | International search | [A]US5354692 (YANG HSIN M [US], et al); | [Y]US6248596 (DURST RICHARD ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2009260767 (GERLI ALESSANDRA [NL], et al); | [A]US2010012284 (KAUB HANS-PETER [DE]); | [Y]US2013078730 (MURCIA MICHAEL J [US], et al) |