EP3033163 - SEPARATOR AND METHOD OF SEPARATION WITH A PRESSURE DIFFERENTIAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I L.L, C. 5950 North Course Drive Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAZIER, Evan T. 2667 Ridgecrest Lane Covington, Kentucky 41017 / US | 02 /
CADY, Eric 1404 Afton Drive Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | 03 /
TIMMERMAN, Michael A. 7181 Tressel Wood Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45248 / US | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2023/12] |
Former [2016/25] | Ljungberg, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14836897.0 | 18.08.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014US51496 | Priority number, date | US201361866956P | 16.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361866956 P | US201361909162P | 26.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361909162 P | US201361909163P | 26.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361909163 P | US201461934700P | 31.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461934700 P | US201461945824P | 28.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461945824 P | US201462004752P | 29.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462004752 P | [2016/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015024012 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3033163 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3033163 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3033163 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/10, E21B21/01, E21B21/06, B07B1/28, B07B13/16, B07B1/46 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
E21B21/065 (EP,US);
B01D33/03 (RU);
B07B1/28 (EP,RU,US);
B07B1/46 (EP,US);
B07B13/16 (EP,US);
E21B21/06 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2016/25] | B01D39/10, E21B21/01, E21B21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARATOR UND TRENNVERFAHREN MIT EINER DRUCKDIFFERENZVORRICHTUNG | [2016/25] | English: | SEPARATOR AND METHOD OF SEPARATION WITH A PRESSURE DIFFERENTIAL DEVICE | [2016/25] | French: | SÉPARATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION AVEC UN DISPOSITIF À DIFFÉRENCE DE PRESSION | [2016/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | IE | 18.08.2023 | LU | 18.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 18.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3927769 ; | [Y]US5595654 (CAUGHMAN JR CARL R [US]); | [XY]US2004011749 (HUTCHINSON ROBERT J [US], et al); | [XY]US2009301939 (SORENSEN JAN HELGE [NO]); | [A]US2011284481 (POMERLEAU DANIEL GUY [CA]); | [Y]US2013074360 (POMERLEAU DANIEL GUY [CA]); | [Y]US2013105412 (BURNETT GEORGE ALEXANDER [GB]) | International search | [Y]US3154805 (WARREN EGEE WALTER, et al); | [A]US4272369 (LOVE LEONARD S); | [A]US4350591 (LEE JOSEPH E); | [A]US5944195 (HUANG PIN Y [US], et al); | [A]US6533946 (PULLMAN DOUG [CA]); | [A]US6910411 (REDDOCH JEFFREY [US]); | [Y]US6988622 (VICTOR JOHN L [US]); | [X]US2009301939 (SORENSEN JAN HELGE [NO]); | [Y]US8025152 (VASSHUS JAN KRISTIAN [NO], et al); | [Y]US2013105412 (BURNETT GEORGE ALEXANDER [GB]); | [A]WO2013101254 (GREEN OILFIELD ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC [US]) | by applicant | US2004011749 | US2009301939 |