EP3036095 - STACK OF FOLDED PAPER PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GPCP IP Holdings LLC 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta, Georgia 30303 / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2016/26] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta GA 30303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENFIELD, Robert Michael 799 Jersey Swamp Road West Chazy, NY 12992 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/26] | 01 /
PENFIELD, Robert Michael 535 Keeler Woods Drive NW Marietta, Georgia 30064 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14837356.6 | 19.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US51632 | Priority number, date | US201313970009 | 19.08.2013 Original published format: US201313970009 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026783 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036095 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B31D1/04, A47K10/42, B65H45/24 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
B65H45/24 (EP,US);
A47K10/42 (EP,US);
A47K2010/428 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24215 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | B31D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | STAPEL AUS GEFALTETEN PAPIERPRODUKTEN | [2016/26] | English: | STACK OF FOLDED PAPER PRODUCTS | [2016/26] | French: | PILE DE PRODUITS DE PAPIER PLIÉ | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 12.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.05.2019 | 14.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012057694 (FORMON JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-14* page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 4; figures 1-3, 4a, 4b * | International search | [A]US4638921 (SIGL WAYNE C [US], et al); | [A]EP0286538 (KAYSERSBERG SA [FR]); | [A]US6250495 (BANDO TAKESHI [JP]); | [X]US2001025856 (LEFEVRE DU GROSRIEZ CAROL [FR], et al); | [A]US8083097 (KAUFMAN KENNETH [US]) | by applicant | WO2012057694 |