EP3137271 - COUNTER-BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Betek GmbH & Co. KG Sulgener Strasse 21-23 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Markus Schillerstr. 10 78733 Aichhalden / DE | 02 /
ARMBRUSTER, Claus-Daniel Alpirsbacher Str. 38 78733 Aichhalden-Röte / DE | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2017/10] | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14838783.0 | 23.12.2014 | [2017/10] | WO2014EP79169 | Priority number, date | DE201410106037 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014106037 | [2017/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015165556 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137271 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137271 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B27L11/02, B27L11/00, B02C18/18 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B02C18/18 (EP,US);
B02C18/186 (EP);
B27L11/00 (EP);
B27L11/005 (EP,US);
B02C2018/188 (EP,US);
B02C2210/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGENSCHNEIDE | [2017/10] | English: | COUNTER-BLADE | [2017/10] | French: | CONTRE-LAME | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 15.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0640449 (RIETER AUTOMATIK GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]US6094795 (DAVENPORT RICKY W [US]); | [Y]JP2010017638 (KUBOTA KK); | [Y]US2011100383 (TILLEY TIMOTHY FRANKLIN [US], et al); | [Y]DE102010016498 (BETEK BERGBAU & HARTMETALL [DE], et al) | by applicant | AT398509B | DE4402111 |